Town of New Windsor et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Town of New Windsor and Corteva, Inc.
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Chubb Fire, LTD, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Afco Avports LLC, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Kidde PLC Inc., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION d/b/a FEDEX, John Does 1-10, Chemguard Inc.,, Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), National Express LLC, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Chem Design Products Inc, Carrier Global Corporation, National Foam Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC.(F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), New York Air National Guard, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, STATE OF NEW YORK, The 3M Company, Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Chemours Company, Federal Express Corporation, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co. and Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv03943
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:21-cv-01496, filed on 05/20/2021. (sjo)
May 19, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/17/21) (sjo)
May 19, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina (sjo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States of America served on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea)
May 14, 2021 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Air National Guard served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; State of New York served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Service was accepted by Cristal Gazelone. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea)
May 7, 2021 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Afco Avports LLC, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Chem Design Products Inc, Chemguard Inc.,, Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chubb Fire, LTD, Corteva, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Federal Express Corporation, Kidde PLC Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Express LLC, National Foam Inc., New York Air National Guard, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, State of New York, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., United States of America..(pc)
May 6, 2021 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, State of New York, New York Air National Guard, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, National Express LLC, AFCO Avports LLC, Federal Express Corporation, Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.), E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, successor-in-interest to United Technologies Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to the Ansul Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chem Design Products, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, LTD., Angus Fire Armour Corporation, National Foam Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, re: #2 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea)
May 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kimberlea Shaw Rea to RE-FILE Document No. #29 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the PDF 'To' section must include 'see attached rider/addendum' under the listed party name;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The United States of America, State of New York, New York Air National Guard, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, National Express LLC, AFCO Avports LLC, Federal Express Corporation, Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.), E.I. DuPont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, successor-in-interest to United Technologies Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P., successor-in-interest to the Ansul Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chem Design Products, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, LTD., Angus Fire Armour Corporation, National Foam Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, re: #2 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/6/2021 (jgo).
May 5, 2021 Filing 28 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rea, Kimberlea)
May 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kimberlea Shaw Rea to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
May 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kimberlea Shaw Rea. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All Parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
May 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kimberlea Shaw Rea. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant). (sj)
May 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kimberlea Shaw Rea to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #27 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #25 Request for Issuance of Summons, #20 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #22 Request for Issuance of Summons, #24 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #21 Request for Issuance of Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #23 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #26 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption must list all parties. If all Defendants do not fit, list leading Defendant followed 'et al'; you can also file one summons with a rider listing all parties as to whom the summons is for. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 4, 2021 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Foam Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus Fire Armour Corporation, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Angus Fire Armour Corporation..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus International Safety Group, LTD., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde PLC Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chemguard Products, Inc, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chemguard, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raytheon Technologies Corporation, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DuPont de Nemours, Inc., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Chemours Company FC LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Chemours Company, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to E.I. DuPont de Nemours & Company, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The 3M Company, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor.(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Express Corporation, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor.(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AFCO Avports LLC, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor.(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express Corporation, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor.(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor.(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Air National Guard, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, re: #2 Complaint, #1 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #2 Complaint, #1 Complaint. Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Afco Avports LLC, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Chem Design Products Inc, Chemguard Inc.,, Chubb Fire, LTD, Corteva, Inc., DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC.(F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.), E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION d/b/a FEDEX, John Does 1-10, Kidde PLC Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Express LLC, National Foam Inc., New York Air National Guard, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, STATE OF NEW YORK, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co), Tyco Fire Products LP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.. Document filed by Town of New Windsor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Rea, Kimberlea)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24489268)Document filed by Town of New Windsor..(Rea, Kimberlea) Modified on 5/5/2021 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of New Windsor et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afco Avports LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION d/b/a FEDEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Aviation FBO Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chem Design Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUPONT DE NEMOURS, INC.(F/K/A DOWDUPONT, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Air National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of New Windsor
Represented By: Kimberlea Shaw Rea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?