Rowe v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adrian Rowe
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv04021
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated July 2, 2021. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated June 23, 2021. Granted. So Ordered. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. answer due 7/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/23/2021) (vfr)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated June 23, 2021. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated 5/27/21. Granted. So Ordered. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. answer due 6/24/2021. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/28/2021) (vfr)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated 5/27/21. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougharty. Document filed by Adrian Rowe..(Blau, Steven)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (sj)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Blau, Steven)
May 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Adrian Rowe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
May 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (sj)
May 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adrian Rowe..(Blau, Steven)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Blau, Steven) Modified on 5/6/2021 (sj).
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-24498424)Document filed by Adrian Rowe..(Blau, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Rowe
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Christopher Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?