Mason et al v. Klein, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Joan Mason and William Mason
Defendant: Steven Klein, M.D., Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc., Montefiore Medical Center and Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc.,
Case Number: 7:2021cv05447
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated July 27, 2021. The Court grants Defendant's second request for an extension of the time to respond to the complaint (to which Plaintiffs consent): Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before August 30, 2021. FINAL EXTENSION. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/27/2021) (vfr)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated July 27, 2021. Document filed by Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc.,..(Cowart, Brandon)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Etra Yoeli on behalf of Montefiore Medical Center..(Yoeli, Matthew)
July 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error, the party name has been separated. (gp)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated June 24, 2021. The first request of Defendant Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc. (the "Health Center") for a extension of the time to answer the complaint from June 28, 2021 to July 29, 2021 is granted. The Health Center is directed to serve this order on Plaintiff and to file proof of service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to file a notice of appearance. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3. SO ORDERED. Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc. answer due 7/29/2021. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/25/2021) (rj)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Brandon Cowart dated June 24, 2021. Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc...(Cowart, Brandon)
June 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
June 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 70101-2018..Document filed by Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Employment Certification)).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason et al v. Klein, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Klein, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Medical Center, Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Etra Yoeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon Neighborhood Health Center, Inc.,
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?