Empire Community Development, LLC v. Buford et al
Plaintiff: Empire Community Development, LLC
Defendant: Helen Buford and Eugene Buford
Case Number: 7:2021cv05498
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Empire Community Development, LLC. Document filed by Helen Buford..(Weathers, Wendy)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) OF DEFENDANT EUGENE BUFORD: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Empire Community Development, LLC, hereby gives notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed only against: Defendant Eugene Buford, without prejudice and without further costs to any party. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Eugene Buford as a Defendant in this action. SO ORDERED. Eugene Buford terminated. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/30/2021) (va)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Eugene Buford. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Weinreb, Alan)
July 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Helen Buford served on 7/7/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. Service was accepted by Helen Buford. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
July 6, 2021 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) Modified on 7/9/2021 (rdz).
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helen Buford..(jgo)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eugene Buford..(jgo)
June 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Helen Buford, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Eugene Buford, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC..(Weinreb, Alan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eugene Buford, Helen Buford. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24709722)Document filed by Empire Community Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice).(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire Community Development, LLC v. Buford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Buford
Represented By: Wendy Marie Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire Community Development, LLC
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?