Zippo v. Pasho et al
Plaintiff: Maria Zippo
Defendant: Ervin Pasho and Bozzuto's Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv06990
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 md
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bozzuto's Inc., Ervin Pasho..(Christman, Steven)
October 15, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bozzuto's Inc., Ervin Pasho..(Christman, Steven)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Ervin Pasho served on 10/15/2021, answer due 11/5/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Maria Zippo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B: Certified Mail Receipt & Signed Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit C: Copy of Summons and Complaint).(Ronai, Holly)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bozzuto's Inc. served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Maria Zippo..(Ronai, Holly)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ervin Pasho. (sj)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bozzuto's Inc.. (sj)
August 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ervin Pasho, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Zippo..(Ronai, Holly)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bozzuto's Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maria Zippo..(Ronai, Holly)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ronai, Holly)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bozzuto's Inc., Ervin Pasho. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24956099)Document filed by Maria Zippo..(Ronai, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zippo v. Pasho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zippo
Represented By: Holly Ostrov Ronai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Pasho
Represented By: Steven Mark Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozzuto's Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?