Bowens v. Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samuel Bowens
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv08040
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of November 29, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/24/2021) (ks)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (23 in 7:21-cv-04021-KMK) Letter filed by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., (12 in 7:21-cv-08040-KMK) Letter filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court will hold a teleconference for both cases on December 2, 2021 at 10:30AM. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/25/2021) (mml)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated October 22, 2021 re: request adjournment of upcoming conferences. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel, as follows: That ACTION NO.1 and ACTION NO. 2, which involve substantially similar questions of law and fact under the New York Labor Law, should be consolidated for all purposes under Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 42(a). Because of considerations of judicial economy, the parties request that the court SO ORDER the consolidation of the above-captioned cases subject to the following terms and conditions: Plaintiff BOWENS shall withdraw his Pre-Motion Letter Seeking Remand of this case. [b] As consolidated, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 15 (a)(2) Plaintiffs shall be permitted to serve and file an Amended Complaint in ACTION NO. 1, substantially in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit A, but adding at least six (6) other persons as party plaintiffs. Defense counsel hereby agrees to accept service of this amended pleading. [c] The time for defendant to answer or move with respect to the Amended Verified Complaint, is hereby extended up to and including November 12, 2021, or 20 days after the Amended Verified Complaint is filed, whichever is later. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/14/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:21-cv-04021-KMK, 7:21-cv-08040-KMK (yv)
October 15, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 7:21-cv-04021-KMK. (yv)
October 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc. answer due 11/12/2021. (yv)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated October 12, 2021 re: Letter in Opposition to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter regarding Remand. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated October 8, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter to Opposing Counsel regarding Motion to Consolidate. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Bartlett, Brett)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter filed by Samuel Bowens. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference to discuss all putative motions on 10/25/2021 at 11:30. SO ORDERED. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/7/2021) (kv)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shelly Leonard on behalf of Samuel Bowens..(Leonard, Shelly)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Steven Bennett Blau dated 10/07/2021 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference to Remand. Document filed by Samuel Bowens..(Blau, Steven)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Bennett Blau on behalf of Samuel Bowens..(Blau, Steven)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc...(Bartlett, Brett)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Brett C. Bartlett dated October 5, 2021 re: Pre-motion Letter to Nonmovant regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bartlett, Brett)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bartlett, Brett)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brett Christopher Bartlett. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Samuel Bowens. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brett Christopher Bartlett to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected; the second page of the PDF was omitted; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the PDF must be filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
September 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Orange. Case Number: EF003199-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25120048).Document filed by Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet).(Bartlett, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowens v. Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Bowens
Represented By: Shelly Leonard
Represented By: Steven Bennett Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Christopher Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?