Rodriguez v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Defendant: Tennessee S. Palmer and A. Valle
Case Number: 7:2021cv08078
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on re: #10 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Anthony Rodriguez denying without prejudice #9 Motion for Award Compensatory Damages and Punitive Damages re: #9 MOTION Award Compensatory Damages and Punitive Dama. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will consider this Declaration as annexed to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion To Award Damages, (Dkt. No. 9), is denied without prejudice as premature. The Court will consider this Motion as annexed to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion, (Dkt. No. 9), and mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/19/21) (yv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2021 Mailed a copy of #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Anthony Rodriguez, DIN: 93A9247 at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929. (kh)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Anthony Rodriguez in Support re: #9 MOTION Award Compensatory Damages and Punitive Dama. Document filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (ok)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Award Compensatory Damages and Punitive Damages. Document filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (ok)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Anthony Rodriguez, DIN: 93A9247, at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929, on 10/6/2021 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Corrections Offficer Tennessee S. Palmer, Corrections Officer A. Valle. (sha)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, along with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further directed to issue summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Correction Officers Tennessee S. Palmer and A. Valle, and to deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/6/21) (yv) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 6, 2021 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 10/6/2021 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Corrections Offficer Tennessee S. Palmer, Corrections Officer A. Valle. (sha)
October 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
September 30, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Clinton Correctional Facility at P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929. (kh)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/29/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (sac)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Tennessee S. Palmer, A. Valle. Document filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (sac)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anthony Rodriguez. (sac)
September 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee S. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?