Miller, M.D. v. Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Michael Miller, M.D.
Defendant: Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al, Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, John/Jane Doe 1-9, M.D. Hal Teitelbaum, M.D. Richard Fuchs, Mary De Freitas, CRH Board of Managers, M.D. Eric Barbanel, Esq. Douglas Sansted, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP and Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv08114
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 11101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed by 1/3/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (sla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit amended complaint addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Gunilla P. Faringer dated November 18, 2021. Document filed by Michael Miller, M.D...(Perez-Faringer, Gunilla)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than November 18, 2021, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter whether he (i) intends to file an amended complaint in response to the motion to dismiss, or (ii) will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the motion will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiff a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendants' motion. If plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, he must file the amended complaint by no later than 14 days after notifying the Court of his intent to do so. Within 21 days of such amendment, defendants may either: (i) file an answer to the amended complaint; (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint; or (iii) notify the Court by letter that they are relying on the initially filed motions to dismiss. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/09/2021) (ama)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Robert I. Steiner in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Eric Barbanel(Individually), Eric Barbanel(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), CRH Board of Managers, Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas(Individually), Mary De Freitas(and in her capacity as director of CRH Human Resource Department), John/Jane Doe 1-9, Richard Fuchs(Individually), Richard Fuchs(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(individually), Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc., Douglas Sansted(and in his capacity as Chief Legal Officer of CHR), Douglas Sansted(Individual )..(Steiner, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Eric Barbanel(Individually), Eric Barbanel(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), CRH Board of Managers, Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas(Individually), Mary De Freitas(and in her capacity as director of CRH Human Resource Department), John/Jane Doe 1-9, Richard Fuchs(Individually), Richard Fuchs(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(individually), Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc., Douglas Sansted(and in his capacity as Chief Legal Officer of CHR), Douglas Sansted(Individual )..(Steiner, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Eric Barbanel(Individually), Eric Barbanel(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), CRH Board of Managers, Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas(Individually), Mary De Freitas(and in her capacity as director of CRH Human Resource Department), John/Jane Doe 1-9, Richard Fuchs(Individually), Richard Fuchs(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(individually), Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc., Douglas Sansted(and in his capacity as Chief Legal Officer of CHR), Douglas Sansted(Individual )..(Steiner, Robert)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gunilla Perez-Faringer on behalf of Michael Miller, M.D...(Perez-Faringer, Gunilla)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: By 11/8/2021, defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (sla)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Notice of Removal,,, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Robert I. Steiner dated October 5, 2021. Document filed by Eric Barbanel(Individually), Eric Barbanel(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), CRH Board of Managers, Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas(Individually), Mary De Freitas(and in her capacity as director of CRH Human Resource Department), John/Jane Doe 1-9, Richard Fuchs(Individually), Richard Fuchs(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Hal Teitelbaum(individually), Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc., Douglas Sansted(and in his capacity as Chief Legal Officer of CHR), Douglas Sansted(Individual )..(Steiner, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF004661-2021..Document filed by Richard Fuchs(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Richard Fuchs(Individually), John/Jane Doe 1-9, Mary De Freitas(Individually), Eric Barbanel(Individually), Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, Mary De Freitas(and in her capacity as director of CRH Human Resource Department), Douglas Sansted(and in his capacity as Chief Legal Officer of CHR), Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc., CRH Board of Managers, Hal Teitelbaum(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH), Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Hal Teitelbaum(individually), Douglas Sansted(Individual ), Eric Barbanel(and in his capacity as an officer of CRH). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents).(Steiner, Robert)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Steiner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Richard Fuchs, Hal D. Teitelbaum, M.D., Mary De Freitas, Eric Barbanel, Douglas Sansted, Mary De Freitas, Crystal Run HealthCare LLP Board of Managers, Montefiore Consolidated Venture, Inc. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly, party name contained an typographical error. (vf)
October 1, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, John/Jane Doe 1-9, Hal D. Teitelbaum, MD, Richard Fuchs, Hal D. Teitelbaum, MD, Mary De Freitas, Crystal Run Healthcare, LLP Board of Managers, Eric Barbanel, Douglas Sansted, Douglas Sansted, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas, Richard Fuchs, Montefiore Consolidated Venture, Inc., Eric Barbanel added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP, John/Jane Doe 1-9, Hal D. Teitelbaum, MD, Richard Fuchs, Hal D. Teitelbaum, MD, Mary De Freitas, Crystal Run Healthcare, LLP Board of Managers, Eric Barbanel, Douglas Sansted, Douglas Sansted, Crystal Run Health Care, LLP, Mary De Freitas, Richard Fuchs, Montefiore Consolidated Venture, Inc., Eric Barbanel. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,..(Steiner, Robert)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert Steiner to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; not all the filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
October 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Steiner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff). (vf)
October 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Steiner on behalf of Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al..(Steiner, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al..(Steiner, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Steiner, Robert)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF004661-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25133547).Document filed by Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Documents).(Steiner, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller, M.D. v. Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller, M.D.
Represented By: Gunilla Perez-Faringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP et al
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Run Health Care Physicians, LLP
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe 1-9
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Hal Teitelbaum
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Richard Fuchs
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary De Freitas
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRH Board of Managers
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Eric Barbanel
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Douglas Sansted
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Run Health Care, LLP
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Consolidated Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?