Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. KeepSolid, Inc.
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Defendant: KeepSolid, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv09045
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Filing 18 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 12/27/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) KeepSolid, Inc.. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant, that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including January 3, 2022; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be executed in counterpart and a facsimile signature shall be deemed to have the same binding effect on the parties hereto as an original. SO ORDERED. KeepSolid, Inc. answer due 1/3/2022., Motions terminated: #14 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint . filed by KeepSolid, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/2/2021) (kv)
December 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Morgan Taylor on behalf of KeepSolid, Inc...(Taylor, Philip)
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by KeepSolid, Inc...(Holden, John)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by KeepSolid, Inc...(Holden, John)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John David Holden on behalf of KeepSolid, Inc...(Holden, John)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. KeepSolid, Inc. served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. Service was accepted by Tetyana Binder. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jay Johnson for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/21) (yv)
November 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 AMENDED MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order).(Johnson, Jay)
November 5, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25289638. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF TEXAS. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to KeepSolid, Inc. (vf)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25289638. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order).(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 11/5/2021 (aea).
November 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Digital Verification Systems, LLC. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KeepSolid, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KeepSolid, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25281844)Document filed by Digital Verification Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Verification Systems, LLC v. KeepSolid, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Verification Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeepSolid, Inc.
Represented By: John David Holden
Represented By: Philip Morgan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?