Smith v. Lasanta et al
Plaintiff: Sincere Smith
Defendant: C.O. R. Lasanta and C.O. John Doe
Case Number: 7:2021cv09509
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Sincere Smith, DIN: 18A4013, at Mid-State Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 216, Marcy, NY 13403-0216, on 12/2/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
December 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correction Officer R. Lasanta. (sha)
December 2, 2021 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/2/2021 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Correction Officer R. Lasanta. (sha)
December 2, 2021 Mailed a copy of #2 Complaint, #7 Order of Service, to Attorney General of the State of New York at 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005. (sha)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Correction Officer R. Lasanta, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service on this defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to Attorney General of the State of New York at: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005. An "Amended Complaint" form is attached to this order. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/1/2021) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/30/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Sincere Smith.(sc)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 30, 2021 Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Mid-State Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 216, Marcy, NY 13403-0216. (dsh)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/17/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/17/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Prisoner authorization) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 17, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to Sincere Smith, DIN: 18A4013 at Mid-State Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 216, Marcy, NY 13403-0216. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Prisoner authorization) (dsh)
November 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe, R. Lasanta. Document filed by Sincere Smith. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sincere Smith. (sac)
November 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lasanta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sincere Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. R. Lasanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?