Streamlined Consultants, Inc. et al v. EBF Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Streamlined Consultants, Inc. doing business as Streamlined Consultants and Moshe Schoenwald
Defendant: EBF Holdings, LLC doing business as Everest Business Funding doing business as EBF
Case Number: 7:2021cv09528
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 Letter Response to Defendants letter dated November 22,2021, filed by Streamlined Consultants, Inc., Moshe Schoenwald. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference via telephone on January 24, 2022 at 12:00 pm. So Ordered., ( Telephone Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/6/21) (yv)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Scott C. Levenson, Esq dated 11/30/2021 re: Response to Defendants letter dated November 22,2021. Document filed by Moshe Schoenwald, Streamlined Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo submitted in case with same Defendant).(Levenson, Scott)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from David A. Picon dated 11/22/2021 re: Pre-motion letter regarding anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by EBF Holdings, LLC..(Picon, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Notice of Removal and documents filed in connection therewith; (2) Defendants Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, filed with the New York Supreme Court, Rockland County; (3) the individual rules of practice for Judge Kenneth M. Karas; (4) the individual practices for Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy; and (5) this Courts Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions served on Plaintiffs Streamlined Consultants, Inc. d/b/a Streamlined Consultants; and Moshe Schoenwald on 11/17/2021 and 11/18/2021. Service was made by Express Mail and New York State Courts Electronic Filing System. Document filed by EBF Holdings, LLC..(Picon, David)
November 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David A. Picon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains;. (pc)
November 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Matthew Jerome Morris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $196,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Fassuliotis on behalf of EBF Holdings, LLC..(Fassuliotis, William)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Jerome Morris on behalf of EBF Holdings, LLC..(Morris, Matthew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EBF Holdings, LLC..(Picon, David)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Picon, David)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 033781/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25348763).Document filed by EBF Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Signed Summons).(Picon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streamlined Consultants, Inc. et al v. EBF Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streamlined Consultants, Inc. doing business as Streamlined Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Schoenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBF Holdings, LLC doing business as Everest Business Funding doing business as EBF
Represented By: Matthew Jerome Morris
Represented By: William Fassuliotis
Represented By: David A. Picon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?