Parker v. United States of America
Petitioner: Darren Parker
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2021cv09558
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #8 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Darren Parker. ENDORSEMENT: Application for an order of reference to the assigned Magistrate Judge denied without prejudice. An order of reference cannot issue absent the signed consent of all parties. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Parker. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 12/27/2021) (js) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 27, 2021 Mailed a copy of #9 Memo Endorsement to Darren Parker, 259836 at Westchester County Jail, P.O. Box 10, Valhalla, NY 10595. (kh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE, CONSENT, & REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Document filed by Darren Parker. (sc)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Darren Parker, 259836, at Westchester County Jail, P.O. Box 10, Valhalla, NY 10595, on 12/9/2021 Re: #6 Order to Answer. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2255: The Court, having concluded that the motion brought under 28 U.S.C. 2255 should not be summarily dismissed as being without merit, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall electronically notify the Criminal Division of the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York that this order has been issued. Within sixty days of the date of this order, the U.S. Attorney's Office shall file an answer or other pleadings in response to the motion. Movant shall have thirty days from the date on which Movant is served with Respondents answer to file a response. Absent further order, the motion will be considered fully submitted as of that date. All further papers filed or submitted for filing must include the criminal docket number and will be docketed in the criminal case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 12/9/2021) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Darren Parker, dated 12/1/21 re: "ORDER" - Movant Darren Parker is in agreement with the Court treating the application as a Motion under 28:2255, and not as a Notice of Appeal. Document filed by Darren Parker.(sc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court directs Mr. Parker, within 60 days, to notify the Court whether he intends his application to be a notice of appeal of his judgment of conviction or whether he wishes to withdraw his application. If Mr. Parker does not inform the Court of his intent within 60 days, the Court will treat the application as a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. No answer shall be required at this time. Because Mr. Parker has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Mr. Parker and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/23/2021) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 23, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Darren Parker, 259836 at Westchester County Jail, P.O. Box 10, Valhalla, NY 10595. (kh)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Darren Parker. (ok)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Darren Parker. (sac)
November 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
November 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cr-00224-PMH. (sac)
November 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darren Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?