Louime v. Camama et al
Plaintiff: David Louime
Defendant: Tamie Camama, Pressley, P. Squire, Bershia, M. Merced and Cho Gutwein
Case Number: 7:2021cv09594
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to David Louime DIN: 17A3218 Sing Sing Correctional Facility 354 Hunter Street Ossining, NY 10562, at, on 12/6/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, Order granting IFP application, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (aan)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bershia, Tamie Camama, Cho Gutwein, M. Merced, Pressley, P. Squire. (aan)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/6/2021 Re: Judge Vincent L. Briccetti #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Bershia, Tamie Camama, Cho Gutwein, M. Merced, Pressley, P. Squire. (aan)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Superintendent Tamie Camama; Correction Officers Pressley, P. Squire, Bershia, and M. Merced; and Hearing Officer Gutwein, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/3/2021) (mml) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/2/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by David Louime.(sc)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by David Louime.(sc)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #5 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility at 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. (kh)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/20/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/20/2021. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/19/2021) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP application, #2 Supplement Prisoner authorization) (scn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization to David Louime, DIN: 17A3218 at Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, NY 10562. (kh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bershia, Tamie Camama, Cho Gutwein, M. Merced, Pressley, P. Squire. Document filed by David Louime. (sac)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louime v. Camama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Louime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamie Camama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bershia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Merced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cho Gutwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?