Roberts et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Gary Roberts, HRH P. Michael Popa, R. Kevin Rodriguez, Jonathan Rosenoer, Mike Carrubba, Bill Ellmore, Michael Butera, Alanna Robinson-Bailey, Kevin Monagle, Philip Philippides, Darin Cross, Darrell Goff, Demone Abrams, Ken Claflin, Alex Campos, Linda Reda, Dwayne Picou, Igancio Angles, Nikhil Patel, Deborah Young, Jim Fyffe, Vidya Sagar, Heidi Pehhrson, Venkat Govindarajan, Jeffrey Werner, Robert Broughton, Piyush Gupta, Michael Matry, Christopher Britton, Peter Toro, Cathy Carney, Patrick O'Boyle, III, Sonja Cardoso, Kam Rezvani, Ron Howell, Jason Proctor, Joshua Fox, Brad Gold, Jonathan Urban, Carlos Castillo, Hershel Bagley, David Roknian and ALL PLAINTIFFS
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 7:2021cv09928
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ag
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Ashleigh A. Musser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/21/2021) (mml)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Steven M. Tindall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/21/2021) (mml)
December 21, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Steven M. Tindall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 21, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Ashleigh A. Musser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494461. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Ashleigh A. Musser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494461. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Musser, Ashleigh)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Steven M. Tindall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25494387. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order ).(Tindall, Steven)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph M. Sellers on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS..(Sellers, Joseph)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/9/2021) (mml)
December 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sellers, Joseph)
December 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25435964. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from The District Of Columbia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25435964. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Demone Abrams, Igancio Angles, Hershel Bagley, Christopher Britton, Robert Broughton, Michael Butera, Alex Campos, Sonja Cardoso, Cathy Carney, Mike Carrubba, Carlos Castillo, Ken Claflin, Darin Cross, Bill Ellmore, Joshua Fox, Jim Fyffe, Darrell Goff, Brad Gold, Venkat Govindarajan, Piyush Gupta, Ron Howell, Michael Matry, Kevin Monagle, Patrick O'Boyle, III, Nikhil Patel, Heidi Pehhrson, Philip Philippides, Dwayne Picou, P. Michael Popa, Jason Proctor, Linda Reda, Kam Rezvani, Gary Roberts, Alanna Robinson-Bailey, R. Kevin Rodriguez, David Roknian, Jonathan Rosenoer, Vidya Sagar, Peter Toro, Jonathan Urban, Jeffrey Werner, Deborah Young. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Sellers, Joseph) Modified on 12/8/2021 (bcu).
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to International Business Machines Corporation..(gp)
November 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
November 29, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 1:18-cv-8434. (gp)
November 29, 2021 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:18-cv-08434-VEC-SLC and declined by Judge Valerie Caproni and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea)
November 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to International Business Machines Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Demone Abrams, Igancio Angles, Hershel Bagley, Christopher Britton, Robert Broughton, Michael Butera, Alex Campos, Sonja Cardoso, Cathy Carney, Mike Carrubba, Carlos Castillo, Ken Claflin, Darin Cross, Bill Ellmore, Joshua Fox, Jim Fyffe, Darrell Goff, Brad Gold, Venkat Govindarajan, Piyush Gupta, Ron Howell, Michael Matry, Kevin Monagle, Patrick O'Boyle, III, Nikhil Patel, Heidi Pehhrson, Philip Philippides, Dwayne Picou, P. Michael Popa, Jason Proctor, Linda Reda, Kam Rezvani, Gary Roberts, Alanna Robinson-Bailey, R. Kevin Rodriguez, David Roknian, Jonathan Rosenoer, Vidya Sagar, Peter Toro, Jonathan Urban, Jeffrey Werner, Deborah Young..(Eisenkraft, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18cv08434. Document filed by Demone Abrams, Igancio Angles, Hershel Bagley, Christopher Britton, Robert Broughton, Michael Butera, Alex Campos, Sonja Cardoso, Cathy Carney, Mike Carrubba, Carlos Castillo, Ken Claflin, Darin Cross, Bill Ellmore, Joshua Fox, Jim Fyffe, Darrell Goff, Brad Gold, Venkat Govindarajan, Piyush Gupta, Ron Howell, Michael Matry, Kevin Monagle, Patrick O'Boyle, III, Nikhil Patel, Heidi Pehhrson, Philip Philippides, Dwayne Picou, P. Michael Popa, Jason Proctor, Linda Reda, Kam Rezvani, Gary Roberts, Alanna Robinson-Bailey, R. Kevin Rodriguez, David Roknian, Jonathan Rosenoer, Vidya Sagar, Peter Toro, Jonathan Urban, Jeffrey Werner, Deborah Young..(Eisenkraft, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Relatedness).(Eisenkraft, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25381053)Document filed by Patrick O'Boyle, III, Sonja Cardoso, Jim Fyffe, Michael Butera, Robert Broughton, P. Michael Popa, Dwayne Picou, Gary Roberts, Igancio Angles, Peter Toro, Linda Reda, Jeffrey Werner, Piyush Gupta, Michael Matry, Carlos Castillo, Deborah Young, Ken Claflin, Venkat Govindarajan, Philip Philippides, Cathy Carney, Ron Howell, Darin Cross, Vidya Sagar, David Roknian, Demone Abrams, Heidi Pehhrson, Christopher Britton, Bill Ellmore, Jonathan Urban, R. Kevin Rodriguez, Jason Proctor, Kevin Monagle, Darrell Goff, Hershel Bagley, Alex Campos, Brad Gold, Alanna Robinson-Bailey, Jonathan Rosenoer, Kam Rezvani, Joshua Fox, Nikhil Patel, Mike Carrubba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Determination).(Eisenkraft, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Roberts
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRH P. Michael Popa
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Kevin Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Rosenoer
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Carrubba
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Ellmore
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Butera
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alanna Robinson-Bailey
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Monagle
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Philippides
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Cross
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Goff
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demone Abrams
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Claflin
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Campos
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Reda
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Picou
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igancio Angles
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikhil Patel
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Young
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Fyffe
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidya Sagar
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Pehhrson
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venkat Govindarajan
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Werner
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Broughton
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piyush Gupta
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Matry
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Britton
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Toro
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Carney
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Boyle, III
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Cardoso
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kam Rezvani
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Howell
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Proctor
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Fox
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Gold
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Urban
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castillo
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hershel Bagley
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Roknian
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Ashleigh Alexa Musser
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?