Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers et al v. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers and Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60
Defendant: Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Laura Marcela Pignataro, Frank Pignataro, Hudson Insurance Company a/k/a Hudson Insurance Group, Hudson Insurance Company and Hudson Insurance Group
Case Number: 7:2021cv10189
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Hudson Insurance Company may have until 2/14/22 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 28, 2022 Filing 30 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Adam P. Friedman dated 1/28/2022. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Friedman, Adam)
January 28, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause for Default Judgment and supporting documents served on Laura Marcela Pignataro on 01/28/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Defendant, Laura Marcela Pignataro, Individually shall show cause by telephone (1-877-336-1839 Code 1047966#) as to why a Judgment by Default should not be entered in favor of Plaintiffs for the relief requested in the Complaint. ORDERED, that objections to the relief requested herein or answering papers, if any, shall be served upon Barnes, Iaccarino & Shepherd, LLP, Attn: Michele J. Harari, Esq., 258 Saw Mill River Road, Elmsford, NY 10523 and filed with the Court by 2/22/2022; and it is further ORDERED, that service of a copy of this Order and supporting papers be made upon Defendant, Laura Marcela Pignataro, Individually, 31 Hunt Avenue, Montrose, New York 10548, by Certified Mail, return receipt requested, and First Class Mail on or before 2/2/2022, and such service shall be deemed good and sufficient service. Proof of service shall be filed on ECF docket. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2022. Telephone Conference set for 2/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/27/2022) (mml)
January 26, 2022 Filing 27 STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 26, 2022 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 26, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Michele J. Harari, Esq. in Support re: #24 Proposed Default Judgment,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 26, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(1). Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #26 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 26, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #24 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
January 25, 2022 Filing 23 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Laura Marcela Pignataro.(km)
January 25, 2022 Filing 22 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/25/2022 (km).
January 25, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIRMATION of Michele J. Harari, Esq. in Support re: #20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 25, 2022 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 1/25/2022 (km).
January 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Michele Harari. RE-FILE Document No. #20 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The information on your clerk's certificate does not match the information on your proof of service. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (km)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Hudson Insurance Company may have until 1/31/22 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Adam P. Friedman dated 1/14/2022. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Friedman, Adam)
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Frank Pignataro served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/31/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers; Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 5, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Laura Marcela Pignataro served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers; Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: STIPULATED by and between the undersigned that the time for Defendant CASABELLA CONTRACTING OF NEW YORK, INC., and FRANK. PIGNATARO, Individually, represented by counsel as set forth below to answer with respect to the complaint is extended from Friday, December 31, 2021, to Monday, January 31, 2022. Defendants waive the affirmative defense of a lack of personal jurisdiction. Dated: Poughkeepsie, New York. SO ORDERED. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. answer due 1/31/2022; Frank Pignataro answer due 1/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/3/2022) (rro)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Pedro Medina, Jr. dated January 3, 2022 re: Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Document filed by Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Frank Pignataro..(Medina, Pedro)
January 3, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Frank Pignataro..(Medina, Pedro)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Hudson Insurance Company may have until 1/18/22 to respond to the Complaint. (1/17/22 is a national holiday.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Adam P. Friedman dated December 21, 2021. Document filed by Hudson Insurance Company..(Friedman, Adam)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Hudson Insurance Company served on 12/10/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers; Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua E. MacKey on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Frank Pignataro..(MacKey, Joshua)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brooke Dana Youngwirth on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Frank Pignataro..(Youngwirth, Brooke)
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pedro Medina, Jr on behalf of Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Frank Pignataro..(Medina, Pedro)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,, served. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers; Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company, Frank Pignataro, Laura Marcela Pignataro..(pc)
December 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michele Joy Harari. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hudson Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Laura Marcela Pignataro, Individually, Frank Pignataro, Individually, and Hudson Insurance Company a/k/a Hudson Insurance Group, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harari, Michele)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company a/k/a Hudson Insurance Group, Frank Pignataro, Laura Marcela Pignataro. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25404743)Document filed by Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers, Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60..(Harari, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers et al v. Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy & Highway Laborers Local No. 60 Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice and Training Fund, the New York State Laborers Employers
Represented By: Michele Joy Harari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Putnam Counties Heavy and Highway Laborers Local No. 60
Represented By: Michele Joy Harari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casabella Contracting of NY, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Represented By: Joshua E. MacKey
Represented By: Pedro Medina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Marcela Pignataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Pignataro
Represented By: Brooke Dana Youngwirth
Represented By: Joshua E. MacKey
Represented By: Pedro Medina, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company a/k/a Hudson Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam P Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Group
Represented By: Adam P Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?