Chaneyfield v. Wilcox
Petitioner: Tyrome Chaneyfield
Respondent: Mrs. Julia Wilcox
Case Number: 7:2021cv10215
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Referring Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and notifying the court of petitioner's death addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Assistant Attorney General Michelle Maerov dated January 28, 2022. Document filed by Julia Wilcox..(Maerov, Michelle)
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Elaine Maerov on behalf of Julia Wilcox..(Maerov, Michelle)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Tyrome Chaneyfield, 15-A-3957, at Attica Correctional Facility, Box 149, Attica, NY 14011-149, on 12/13/2021 Re: #3 Order to Answer, 28 U.S.C. 2254. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER: Having determined that this petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 should not be summarily dismissed, the Court hereby directs that: The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order and the Petition on the Attorney General of the State of New York and on the District Attorney of Sullivan County by electronic means through the use of the Court's CM/ECF system. Within sixty days of the date of this Order, Respondent must file and serve: (1) an answer, motion, or other response to the Petition; and (2) the transcripts and briefs identified in Rule 5(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file and serve any reply papers within thirty days from the date Petitioner is served with Respondent's answer. SO ORDERED. Julia Wilcox answer due on 2/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 12/13/2021) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
December 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. County of Conviction: Sullivan. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 465401289939)Document filed by Tyrome Chaneyfield.(rdz)
November 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaneyfield v. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrome Chaneyfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mrs. Julia Wilcox
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: SULLIVAN COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERI
Represented By: Michelle Elaine Maerov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?