Streamlined Consultants, Inc. et al v. Forward Financing LLC et al
Plaintiff: STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS, INC. d/b/a STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS, Moshe Schoenwald and Streamlined Consultants, Inc. doing business as Streamlined Consultants
Defendant: FORWARD FINANCING LLC d/b/a FORWARD FINANCING, SPLASH ADVANCE, LLC and Forward Financing LLC doing business as Forward Financing LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv10838
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 294
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court is in receipt of the attached letter from Defendant Forward Financing, dated December 20, 2021, seeking leave to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' action, and the attached letter from Plaintiffs, dated December 27, 2021, seeking leave to file a cross-motion to remand the case to state court. Accordingly, the Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement and grants the parties leave to file their proposed motions pursuant to the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendant Forward Financings moving papers are to be served (not filed) on January 26, 2022; (2) Plaintiffs' opposition/cross-moving papers are to be served (not filed) on February 25, 2022; (3) Defendant Forward Financing's reply/cross-opposition papers are to be served (not filed) on March 28, 2022; and (4) Plaintiffs' cross-reply papers are to be served on April 13, 2022. All motion papers are to be filed by the parties on the cross-reply date, April 13, 2022. The parties are directed to provide Chambers with two physical courtesy copies of their motion papers on the same date they are served on opposing counsel. The parties are further directed to provide the Court with an electronic courtesy copy of the motion papers as they are served per this Court's local emergency civil rules. The Court also kindly directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/27/2021) (mml)
December 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 4/13/2022. Motions due by 4/13/2022. Responses due by 4/13/2022. Replies due by 4/13/2022. (mml)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Scott C. Levenson, Esq dated December 27, 2021 re: #3 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Christopher R. Murray, Esq. dated December 20, 2021. Letter Opposing Motion to Dismiss and Requesting Leave to file for Remand. Document filed by Moshe Schoenwald, Streamlined Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on 10.22.21, #2 Exhibit Mass Corporation Entity Summary - Forward Financing, #3 Exhibit Mass Corporation Entity Summary - Forward Financing SPV).(Levenson, Scott)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Christopher R. Murray, Esq. dated December 20, 2021. Document filed by Forward Financing LLC..(Murray, Christopher)
December 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher Ryan Murray. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS, INC. d/b/a STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS, FORWARD FINANCING LLC d/b/a FORWARD FINANCING, SPLASH ADVANCE, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
December 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher Ryan Murray. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294; Dollar Demand $118,260,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $118,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
December 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Murray, Christopher)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 033782/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25485347).Document filed by FORWARD FINANCING LLC d/b/a FORWARD FINANCING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Docket Report, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service Showing Service Defective, #5 Exhibit E - LeBlanc Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Docket).(Murray, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streamlined Consultants, Inc. et al v. Forward Financing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS, INC. d/b/a STREAMLINED CONSULTANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Schoenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streamlined Consultants, Inc. doing business as Streamlined Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORWARD FINANCING LLC d/b/a FORWARD FINANCING
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPLASH ADVANCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forward Financing LLC doing business as Forward Financing LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?