United States of America v. Colasuonno
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Philip Colasuonno
Case Number: 7:2021cv10877
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6672
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America. Document filed by Philip Colasuonno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit relieved of liability letter).(Flynn, Erin)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Philip Colasuonno waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philip Colasuonno..(pc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sun, Anthony)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anthony Jan-Huan Sun to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jurisdiction was not selected. (pc)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anthony Jan-Huan Sun. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (pc)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Philip Colasuonno, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sun, Anthony) Modified on 12/21/2021 (pc).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philip Colasuonno. Document filed by United States of America..(Sun, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Colasuonno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Jan-Huan Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Colasuonno
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?