Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC v. Hwang
Plaintiff: Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC
Defendant: Youn Do Hwang doing business as Debrich Cleaners
Case Number: 7:2021cv10921
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. (And as further set forth herein.) Initial Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern..(jca)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER terminating #7 Motion for Order to Show Cause; terminating #8 Motion to Dismiss. Despite their captions, in light of the substance of the pro se filings, the Court deems the documents, Doc. 7 and Doc. 8, together, to be Defendant's Answer to the Complaint. The Court will separately docket a Notice scheduling an Initial Pretrial Conference. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to: (1) terminate the motions pending at Doc. 7 and Doc. 8; (2) update the docket sheet to reflect the address of the pro se Defendant, Youn Do Hwang, as indicated in his Answer: 9 East Lawrence Park Drive, #4, Piermont, New York 10968; and (3) mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Defendant at that address. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/17/2022) (jca)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Robert B. Weissman dated 2/17/2022 re: Requesting Clarification or Conference Regarding Pro Se Defendant's Answer-Order to Show Cause-Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC..(Weissman, Robert)
February 17, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Youn Do Hwang. (ok)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Youn Do Hwang. (ok)
February 17, 2022 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #10 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jca)
February 17, 2022 Mailed a copy of #10 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion to Dismiss to Youn Do Hwang at 9 East Lawrence Park Drive, #4, Piermont, New York 10968. (kh)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Youn Do Hwang served on 1/15/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. Service was accepted by Fun Hee, Co-Tenant. Document filed by Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC..(Weissman, Robert)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Do Youn Hwang..(gp)
December 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Benjamin Weissman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Do Youn Hwang. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (gp)
December 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
December 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC..(Weissman, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weissman, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Youn Do Hwang individually, d/b/a "Debrich Cleaners", re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC..(Weissman, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Youn Do Hwang individually, d/b/a "Debrich Cleaners". (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25494786)Document filed by Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Lease, #3 Exhibit C - First Lease Amendment, #4 Exhibit D - Second Lease Amendment).(Weissman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC v. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenburgh Shopping Center Associates, LLC
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youn Do Hwang doing business as Debrich Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?