Dodd v. My Sisters' Place, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Andre Dodd
Defendant: My Sisters' Place, Inc., Karen Cheeks-Lomax, Thomas Rice, Robert R. Gheewalla, Suzanne Seiden, Barbara Raho, Evan J. Cohen, Cheryl Greenberg, Peter Cutaia, Maria Faustino, Dania Jones-Brown and Christina Debonis
Case Number: 7:2021cv10987
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Marcus Andre Dodd, at 4646 North Beacon Street, #102, Chicago, IL 60640, on 1/24/2022 Re: #10 Order of Service, Terminate Motions. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (sha)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Karen Cheeks-Lomax, Evan J. Cohen, Peter Cutaia, Christina Debonis, Maria Faustino, Robert R. Gheewalla, Cheryl Greenberg, Dania Jones-Brown, My Sisters' Place, Inc., Barbara Raho, Thomas Rice, Suzanne Seiden. (sha)
January 24, 2022 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 1/24/2022 Re: Judge Vincent L. Briccetti #10 Order of Service, Terminate Motions. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Karen Cheeks-Lomax, Evan J. Cohen, Peter Cutaia, Christina Debonis, Maria Faustino, Robert R. Gheewalla, Cheryl Greenberg, Dania Jones-Brown, My Sisters' Place, Inc., Barbara Raho, Thomas Rice, Suzanne Seiden. (sha)
January 21, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from M. Dodd, dated 1/21/22 re: I was reviewing the Order of Service issued today, and I noticed that the name of Defendant Cheryl Greenberg is spelled incorrectly in a few places in the order etc. There should be no "u" in the spelling of Greenberg. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd.(sc)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the court's Mediation' Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bona counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed by February 4, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/21/2022) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for permission for electronic case filing. (ECF 5.) The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to: (1) issue summonses for the defendants, (2) complete USM-285 forms with the service addresses of the defendants, and (3) deliver all documents necessary to effect service of summonses and the complaint on the defendants to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court denies Plaintiff's application for the Court to request pro bono counsel without prejudice to Plaintiff's filing another such application at a later date. (ECF 4.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Permission for Marcus A. Dodd to participate in electronic case filing in this case. filed by Marcus Andre Dodd, #4 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. filed by Marcus Andre Dodd. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 1/21/2022) (mml) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 21, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
January 21, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from M. Dodd, dated 1/21/22 re: I request for Judge Vincent L. Briccetti to issue Summons for all of the defendants. Thank you. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd.(sc)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER from Marcus Dodd dated 1/20/22 re: Supplemental Information: Please add the following addresses to the defendants in this case. Defendant Addresses: My Sisters' Place Inc. c/o Karen Cheek-Lomax, 3 Barker Ave., 5th Floor, White Plains, NY 10601; Karen Cheeks-Lomax, 112 Esplanade, Mt. Vernon, NY 10553; Thomas Rice, 15 Thornewood Rd., Armonk, NY 10504; Rob Gheewalla, 325 Weaver Street, Larchmont, NY 10538; Suzanne Seiden, 22 Fairway Drive, Mamaroneck, NY 10543; Barbara Raho, 63 Park Dr. S., Rye, NY 10580; Evan J. Cohen, 3 Magnolia Drive, Purchase, NY 10577; Christina Debonis, 7001 Chelsea Cove, Hopewell Junction, NY 12533; Peter Cutaia, 99 Christine Court, Stormville, NY 12582; Cheryl Greenberg, 10 Nosband Ave., Apt. 5M, White Plains, NY 10605; Maria Faustino, 81 Cramer Rd., Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 and Dania Jones-Brown, My Sisters' Place, Human Resources, 3 Barker Ave., 5th Floor, White Plains, NY 10601. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd.(sc)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/19/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Marcus A. Dodd to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd.(sc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd. (sac)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Marcus Andre Dodd consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd. (sac)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Karen Cheeks-Lomax, Evan J. Cohen, Peter Cutaia, Christina Debonis, Maria Faustino, Robert R. Gheewalla, Cheryl Greenberg, Dania Jones-Brown, My Sisters' Place, Inc., Barbara Raho, Thomas Rice, Suzanne Seiden. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Sue EEOC) (sac)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Marcus Andre Dodd. (sac)
December 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd v. My Sisters' Place, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Andre Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Sisters' Place, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Cheeks-Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Gheewalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Seiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Raho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Cutaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Faustino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dania Jones-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Debonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?