Garcia v. Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Garcia
Defendant: Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc. and Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2022cv01736
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on re: #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Christopher Garcia granting #11 Letter Motion for Conference re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Blaec C. Croft dated April 18, 2022. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a Pre-Motion Conference on 5/9/22, at 11:00. So Ordered. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/27/22) (yv)
April 20, 2022 Filing 12 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. dated April 20, 2022 re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Blaec C. Croft dated April 18, 2022. . Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Blaec C. Croft dated April 18, 2022. Document filed by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc...(Croft, Blaec)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Philip A. Goldstein dated March 23, 2022., #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. answer due 4/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/25/2022) (tg)
March 24, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Philip A. Goldstein dated March 23, 2022. Document filed by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc...(Goldstein, Philip)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc. served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service was accepted by Victoria Lacerda, Paralegal. Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service was accepted by Kaneisha Gross, Clerk for CSC. Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc.. (vf)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (vf)
March 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
March 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
March 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25803183)Document filed by Christopher Garcia..(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Garcia
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezba Asset Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Blaec C Croft
Represented By: Philip A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?