Kuncio v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Kuncio
Defendant: Marques O. Armstrong and Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2022cv01752
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mv Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Thursday, May 12, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/18/2022) (vfr)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Marques O. Armstrong..(Fogarty, Edward)
March 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Burke VanDina on behalf of Stephen A. Kuncio..(VanDina, Jonathan)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Overbeck, Brittaney)
March 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John Andrew Hsu. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
March 3, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney John Andrew Hsu to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brittaney Joyce Overbeck on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc...(Overbeck, Brittaney)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hsu, John) Modified on 3/3/2022 (pc).
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc..(Hsu, John)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.Com, Inc. for Amazon Logistics, Inc.. Document filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc...(Hsu, John)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 67596/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25806275).Document filed by Amazon Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint and AOS, #2 Exhibit Amazon Answer and Demands, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response, #4 Exhibit NYSEF Print Out, #5 Exhibit Police Report).(Hsu, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuncio v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Kuncio
Represented By: Jonathan Burke VanDina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marques O. Armstrong
Represented By: Edward M. Fogarty, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Brittaney Joyce Overbeck
Represented By: John Andrew Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?