Mae v. Quickway Estates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Defendant: Quickway Estates LLC, Jacob Grunhut, NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown), ABC LLC 1-10, XYZ Corp 1-10 and John and Jane Does 1-10
Receiver: Harvey L. Greenberg
Case Number: 7:2022cv03048
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Conference re: #20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference to Appoint Property Manager addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Harvey L. Greenberg dated 6/6/2022. Granted So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/7/2022) (ate)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference to Appoint Property Manager addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Harvey L. Greenberg dated 6/6/2022. Document filed by Harvey L. Greenberg..(Greenberg, Harvey)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BOND OF RECEIVER BOND # CFB 9401071 in the amount of $ 55,200.00 posted by Harvey L. Greenberg. (fk)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the undersigned counsel tor the parties that the time for defendants Quickway Estates, LLC and Jacob Grunhut ("Defendants") to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint in the above-captioned action is extended until and including June 24, 2022; So Ordered. (Jacob Grunhut answer due 6/24/2022; Quickway Estates LLC answer due 6/24/2022.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/13/22) (yv)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jacob Grunhut, Quickway Estates LLC..(Rosenberg, Jeremy)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AT MORTGAGED PROPERTY. It is ORDERED, that Harvey L. Greenberg, Esq. (Fiduciary No.: 131465) of Greenberg & Wilner ("Receiver") be and he hereby is appointed, with the usual powers and directions along with those set forth in this Order, Receiver for the benefit of the Mortgaged Property and the Plaintiff of all the rents and profits now due during the pendency of this action and issuing out of the Mortgaged Property as set forth in the Complaint which is encumbered by Plaintiff's Mortgage liens; and it is further ORDERED, that the Receiver is authorized to forthwith take charge, operate and enter into possession of the Mortgaged Property; and it is further ORDERED, that Receiver shall manage and otherwise control the Mortgaged Property; and it is further ORDERED, that before entering upon his duties, said Receiver shall be sworn to fairly and faithfully discharge the trust committed to him and this oath shall be filed with the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District, and shall execute to the People of the State of New York and file with the Clerk of this Court an undertaking in the penal sum of $55,200, conditioned for the faithful discharge of his duties as such Receiver; and it is further ORDERED, Receiver shall have all necessary powers to lease, operate, and otherwise manage the Mortgaged Property including, without limitation, the following powers and responsibilities as further set forth in this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that, subject to the Court's final review, approval and confirmation, the Receiver shall be compensated by the payment of a commission in the amount of five-percent (5%) of the sums received and disbursed by the Receiver; and it is further, ORDERED, that said Receiver be and hereby is authorized to make any prudent, reasonable, and necessary repairs or work to the Mortgaged Property and undertake such action, provided that, the cost of such repairs and work do not exceed $3,500.00 in the aggregate, or Receiver has obtained Plaintiff's written consent to make such repairs or conduct such work and as further set forth in this Order; ENTER. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/4/22) (yv) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Dominic Dellaporte of Metro Attorney Service, Inc. Affidavit of Posting Pursuant to RPAPL 1303. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jacob Grunhut served on 4/27/2022, answer due 5/18/2022. Service was accepted by Rachel Grunhut, daughter. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mark A. Slama, Esq. dated 5/3/22 re: Updated Proposed Order Appointing Receiver. Document filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Updated Proposed Order).(Slama, Mark)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Tenants on 4/26/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Quickway Estates LLC served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Amy Leach, an agent of the Secretary of State of New York. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Department of Taxation And Finance served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service was accepted by Kelly Heidium, Tax Assistant. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jacob Grunhut..(pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Taxation And Finance..(pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quickway Estates LLC..(pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Anthony Slama. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown), NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE, Fannie Mae,. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Anthony Slama. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $2,164,075,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,164,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Receiver(s) Fannie Mae . Document filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Appointing Receiver, #2 Declaration of Mark Slama, Esq., #3 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 1A Complaint thru Ex. D-1, #4 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 1B Ex. D-2 of Complaint thru Ex. I, #5 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 2 Notice of Pendency, #6 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 3 Rent Roll 10/31/2019, #7 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 4 Part 36-Eligibility List Results, #8 Slama Declaration-Exhibit 5 Proposed Receiver CV).(Slama, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Taxation & Finance, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jacob Grunhut, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quickway Estates LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fannie Mae..(Slama, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Slama, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC LLC 1-10, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown), Jacob Grunhut, NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE, Quickway Estates LLC, XYZ Corp 1-10. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26000732)Document filed by Fannie Mae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Gap Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - CEMA, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-1 - Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-2 - Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Guaranty, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Consolidated Assignment, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Collateral Assignment, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Default Ltr, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - 8-3-21 correspondence).(Slama, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mae v. Quickway Estates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quickway Estates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Grunhut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10 (said names being fictitious and unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LLC 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Mark Anthony Slama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Harvey L. Greenberg
Represented By: Harvey L. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?