Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC et al v. Greenwood Marketing, LLC
Plaintiff: Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC and Brock USA, LLC
Defendant: Greenwood Marketing, LLC d/b/a Restorative Medical or Spry Therapeutics doing business as Restorative Medical doing business as Spry Therapeutics and Greenwood Marketing, LLC doing business as Restorative Medical doing business as Spry Therapeutics
Case Number: 7:2022cv03719
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Steven D. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26363060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of S Moore, #2 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing GA, #3 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing NC, #4 Exhibit C - Cert of Good Standing CA, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Moore, Steven)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for D. Clay Holloway to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 27, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for D. Clay Holloway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26325501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 24, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for D. Clay Holloway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26325501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C Holloway, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Holloway, D.)
June 21, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for D, Clay Holloway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26301791. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from District of Columbia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
June 20, 2022 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for D, Clay Holloway to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26301791. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C Holloway, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Holloway, D.) Modified on 6/21/2022 (sgz).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Sarah F. Glendon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 16, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Sarah F. Glendon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26286966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 15, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Sarah F. Glendon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26286966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of S Glendon, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Glendon, Sarah)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Rishi Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 15, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Rishi Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26282870. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 15, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #20 MOTION for Steven D. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26282867. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of North Carolina and Supreme Court of Georgia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
June 14, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Rishi Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26282870. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R Gupta, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Gupta, Rishi)
June 14, 2022 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Steven D. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26282867. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of S Moore, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Moore, Steven) Modified on 6/15/2022 (sgz).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for David J. Sheikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 13, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for David J. Sheikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26267169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 10, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for David J. Sheikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26267169. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of D Sheikh, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Sheikh, David)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Andrew N. Saul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 10, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Andrew N. Saul to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26262486. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
June 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Andrew N. Saul to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26262486. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of A Saul, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Saul, Andrew)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 : Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by 7/11/22. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this Text Order to Defendant. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (AK)
June 8, 2022 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Frederick Whitmer dated June 6 2022. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC, Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 18, 2022 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC. (sj)
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC d/b/a Restorative Medical or Spry Therapeutics, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC, Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 13, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC. (sj)
May 12, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC d/b/a Restorative Medical or Spry Therapeutics, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC, Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC..(pc)
May 9, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 9, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 9, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Frederick L. Whitmer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): If jurisdiction is Federal Question, do not fill out citizenship of principal parties;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
May 9, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Greenwood Marketing, LLC d/b/a Restorative Medical or Spry Therapeutics, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC, Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brock USA, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Molnlycke Health Care AB for Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC. Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Whitmer, Frederick)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenwood Marketing, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26115867)Document filed by Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC, Brock USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C).(Whitmer, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC et al v. Greenwood Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molnlycke Health Care US, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Represented By: Andrew N Saul
Represented By: D. Clay Holloway
Represented By: Rishi Gupta
Represented By: Sarah Glendon
Represented By: Steven D. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock USA, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Represented By: David Sheikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Marketing, LLC d/b/a Restorative Medical or Spry Therapeutics doing business as Restorative Medical doing business as Spry Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Marketing, LLC doing business as Restorative Medical doing business as Spry Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?