Dabbs v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Plaintiff: Wayne Dabbs
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Case Number: 7:2022cv04599
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
June 17, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Metro-North Commuter Railroad waiver sent on 6/8/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. Document filed by Wayne Dabbs..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 6, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad..(pc)
June 6, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 6, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wayne Dabbs..(Wietzke, Marc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26232879)Document filed by Wayne Dabbs..(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabbs v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Dabbs
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?