United States of America v. Liu et al
Counter Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Phillip Liu and Ellen Chan-Liu
Counter Claimant: Citimortgage Inc. and Cenlar FSB
Case Number: 7:2022cv05776
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability - Authorization to collect via civil action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for an initial conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, September 21, 2022 at 10:45 a.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/24/22) (yv)
August 19, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America. Document filed by Citimortgage Inc., Cenlar FSB..(Klein, Robyn)
August 19, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Ellen Chan-Liu, Phillip Liu. Document filed by Cenlar FSB, Citimortgage Inc...(Klein, Robyn)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cenlar FSB served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. Service was accepted by Frank Andreanszki. Document filed by United States of America..(Kornreich, Mollie)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Citimortgage Inc. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. Service was accepted by Laurie Darrough, paralegal. Document filed by United States of America..(Kornreich, Mollie)
August 8, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Ellen Chan-Liu served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Service was accepted by Phillip Liu. Document filed by United States of America..(Kornreich, Mollie)
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Phillip Liu served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Service was accepted by Phillip Liu. Document filed by United States of America..(Kornreich, Mollie)
August 8, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cenlar FSB, Citimortgage Inc...(Klein, Robyn)
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robyn Erica Klein on behalf of Cenlar FSB, Citimortgage Inc...(Klein, Robyn)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Chan-Liu, Phillip Liu..(Morgenstern, Jeff)
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citimortgage Inc.. (vf)
July 8, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CitiMortgage Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America..(Kornreich, Mollie)
July 8, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ellen Chan-Liu. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cenlar FSB. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phillip Liu. (sj)
July 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mollie Melissa Kornreich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
July 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mollie Melissa Kornreich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
July 8, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 8, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 8, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mollie Melissa Kornreich to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; typographical error in party in 'TO' field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cenlar FSB, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Kornreich, Mollie)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CitiMortgage Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Kornreich, Mollie) Modified on 7/8/2022 (sj).
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ellen Chan-Liu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Kornreich, Mollie)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phillip Liu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Kornreich, Mollie)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornreich, Mollie)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenlar FSB, Ellen Chan-Liu, Citimortgage Inc., Phillip Liu. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Kornreich, Mollie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Liu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mollie Melissa Kornreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Phillip Liu
Represented By: Jeff Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ellen Chan-Liu
Represented By: Jeff Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Citimortgage Inc.
Represented By: Robyn Erica Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cenlar FSB
Represented By: Robyn Erica Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?