Gianni Versace, S.r.l. v. R & B Online Trading, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Gianni Versace, S.r.l.
Defendant: R & B Online Trading, Corp., Roman Bondarenko and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 7:2022cv06081
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. R & B Online Trading, Corp. served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Frank A. Mazzeo dated 09/06/2022. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Roman Bondarenko answer due 10/6/2022. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/7/2022) (jca)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Frank A. Mazzeo dated 09/06/2022. Document filed by Roman Bondarenko..(Mazzeo, Frank)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Roman Bondarenko served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. Service was accepted by Yana Stepanova. Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roman Bondarenko. (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R & B Online Trading, Corp.. (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roman Bondarenko, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R & B Online Trading, Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Capri Holdings Limited for Gianni Versace, S.r.l.. Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roman Bondarenko, John Does 1-5, R & B Online Trading, Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26426038)Document filed by Gianni Versace, S.r.l...(Lee, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianni Versace, S.r.l. v. R & B Online Trading, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianni Versace, S.r.l.
Represented By: Michael Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & B Online Trading, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Bondarenko
Represented By: Frank A Mazzeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?