A.S. v. J.M. et al
Plaintiff: A.S., an infant by and through his mother and natural guardian Tara Moccio and A.S.
Defendant: J.M. Makowski, Teresa Makowski, Daniel Jenkins, Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, Anthony Cogliandro, Donald Rodrigues, Krane Ratings Inc., Black Dragon Martial Arts LLC, Britos Martial Arts LLC and J.M.
Case Number: 7:2022cv06223
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for the Defendant ANTHONY COGLIANDRO to answer the Amended Complaint herein is hereby extended to and including October 11, 2022. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the defendant, ANTHONY COGLIANDRO will not raise the affirmative defense of lack of personal jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. Anthony Cogliandro answer due 10/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/14/2022) (ate)
September 14, 2022 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by A.S...(Carolei, Carmine)
September 13, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donald Rodrigues served on 8/18/2022, answer due 10/10/2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by A.S...(Carolei, Carmine)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for the Defendant. DONALD RODRIGUES to answer the Amended Complaint herein is hereby extended to and including October 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Donald Rodrigues answer due 10/10/2022. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/12/2022) (mml)
September 12, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by A.S...(Carolei, Carmine)
September 8, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service was accepted by Daniel Jenkins. Document filed by A.S...(Carolei, Carmine)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Anthony Cogliandro served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. Service was made by 08/10/2022. Document filed by A.S...(Carolei, Carmine)
August 3, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Cogliandro, Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, Donald Rodrigues..(pc)
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Connecticut Power Fit Expo, Anthony Cogliandro, Donald Rodrigues, re: #5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by A.S...(Lipton, Levi)
July 29, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Levi Lipton to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney information section of Summons PDF not provided; and Docket entry error. Enter the party names as to whom the summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, et al, re: #5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by A.S...(Lipton, Levi) Modified on 7/29/2022 (vf).
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Anthony Cogliandro, Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, Donald Rodrigues with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by A.S.. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Lipton, Levi)
July 27, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Levi Lipton to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption on pdf summons must correspond precisely to pleading. If all party information does not fit in the space provided, name the first listed defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.M. by Teresa Makowski; Daniel Jenkins; Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC; Anthony Cogliandro; Donald Rodrigues; Krane Ratings, Inc.; Black Dragon Martial Arts LLC; Britos Martial Arts, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by A.S...(Lipton, Levi) Modified on 7/27/2022 (lal).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Accordingly, by July 28, 2022, plaintiff's counsel shall submit a letter identifying the members of Britos and their citizenships, so that the Court can determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction. In the event plaintiff's counsel can demonstrate that Britos is not a citizen of New York, counsel shall also identify the members of the two other LLC defendants-Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, and Black Dragon Martial Arts, LLC-and those members' citizenships, so that the Court can determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/26/2022) (mml)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lipton, Levi)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Levi Lipton. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Teresa Makowski. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Levi Lipton. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J.M. Makowski, A.S., an infant by and through his mother and natural guardian Tara Moccio.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
July 25, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Levi Lipton. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
July 25, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 25, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 25, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Black Dragon Martial Arts LLC, Britos Martial Arts LLC, Anthony Cogliandro, Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC, Daniel Jenkins, Krane Ratings Inc., J.M. Makowski, Teresa Makowski, Donald Rodrigues. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26449754)Document filed by A.S., an infant by and through his mother and natural guardian Tara Moccio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Lipton, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.S. v. J.M. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S., an infant by and through his mother and natural guardian Tara Moccio
Represented By: Levi Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Levi Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Makowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Makowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Power Fit Expo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Cogliandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krane Ratings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Dragon Martial Arts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britos Martial Arts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?