Cahill v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Doreen Cahill
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. and Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2022cv07507
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.s time to respond to the complaint in this action is hereby extended to and including November 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. answer due 11/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/28/2022) (mml)
October 28, 2022 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(Solomon, Louis)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that defendant Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.'s time to respond to the complaint in this action is hereby extended to and including November 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. answer due 11/14/2022. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/13/2022) (mml) Modified on 10/17/2022 (mml).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that defendant Keurig Green Mountain Inc.'s time to respond to the complaint in this action is hereby extended to and including November 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. answer due 11/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/13/2022) (mml)
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(Solomon, Louis)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc...(Solomon, Louis)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. Service was accepted by Nadia Bellamy, Employee. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip)
October 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. Service was accepted by Scott Kuntz, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip)
September 2, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(pc)
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keurig Green Mountain, Inc...(pc)
September 2, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip)
September 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State). (sj)
September 2, 2022 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Plaintiff's attorney information is omitted on PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
September 2, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 2, 2022 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 2, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 1, 2022 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip) Modified on 9/2/2022 (sj).
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip) Modified on 9/2/2022 (sj).
September 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fraietta, Philip)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26627216)Document filed by Doreen Cahill..(Fraietta, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cahill v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Cahill
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keurig Green Mountain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?