Tay v. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Plaintiff: Berlinda Tay
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Case Number: 7:2022cv08379
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Jill K. Bigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Jill Bigler, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/22) (yv)
November 9, 2022 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Jill K. Bigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26932252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
November 8, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Jill K. Bigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26932252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order For The Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jill Bigler).(Bigler, Jill)
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Gilbert Cesaratto on behalf of The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Cesaratto, Brian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adriana Stefanie Kosovych on behalf of The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Kosovych, Adriana)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Stuart Frank on behalf of The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(Frank, James)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital waiver sent on 11/2/2022, answer due 1/1/2023. Document filed by Berlinda Tay..(Lee, C.K.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. Document filed by Berlinda Tay..(Lee, C.K.)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The New York and Presbyterian Hospital..(pc)
October 3, 2022 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 3, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 3, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Berlinda Tay..(Lee, C.K.)
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The New York and Presbyterian Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Berlinda Tay..(Lee, C.K.)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26758964)Document filed by Berlinda Tay..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tay v. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berlinda Tay
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
Represented By: Brian Gilbert Cesaratto
Represented By: Jill K. Bigler
Represented By: James Stuart Frank
Represented By: Adriana Stefanie Kosovych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?