Palm v. Brooks et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas M. Palm
Defendant: Srg. Jessica Brooks, Trooper Tyller K. Carrozzo and Trooper Nathaneal Schack
Case Number: 7:2022cv09729
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Nicholas M. Palm, 202201218, at Orange County Correctional Facility, 110 Wells Farm Rd., Goshen, NY 10924, on 12/19/2022 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sgt. Jessica Brooks, Trooper Tyller K. Carrozzo, Trooper Nathaneal Schack. (sha)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF SERVICE: the Court granted Plaintiff's request to proceed informa pauperis ("IFP"), that is, without prepayment of fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses for Sgt. Jessica Brooks, Trooper Tyller K. Carrozza, and Trooper Nathaneal Schack, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail an information package to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. USM-285 Form due by 1/18/2023. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 1/18/2023. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/19/2022) (ama)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/19/2022 Re: Judge Vincent L. Briccetti #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Sgt. Jessica Brooks, Trooper Tyller K. Carrozzo, Trooper Nathaneal Schack. (sha)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Orange County Correctional Facility 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (dsh)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/7/2022) (vn)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Nicholas M. Palm.(sc)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Nicholas M. Palm.(sc)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Nicholas M. Palm 202201218 Orange County Correctional Facility 110 Wells Farm Rd. Goshen, NY 10924. (kh)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/21/2022. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/21/2022. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/21/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2022) (sha)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIRMATION. Document filed by Nicholas M. Palm..(rdz)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessica Brooks, Tyller K. Carrozzo, Nathaneal Schack. Document filed by Nicholas M. Palm..(rdz) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/16/2022) (rdz).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas M. Palm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srg. Jessica Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Tyller K. Carrozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Nathaneal Schack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?