Hall et al v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: John E. Hall, The Estate of Scott Hall, Nancy Hall-Duncan and Jeffrey Reese Hall
Defendant: Donna Hall, Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America and CBRE Services, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2022cv10129
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Civil Enforcement of Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie R Ledwig on behalf of Donna Hall..(Ledwig, Julie)
January 14, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Lenihan on behalf of Jeffrey Reese Hall, Nancy Hall-Duncan, The Estate of Scott Hall..(Lenihan, James)
January 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Lenihan on behalf of John E. Hall(and as Administrator of the Estate of Scott Hall)..(Lenihan, James)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America..(Begos, Patrick)
December 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mathew Paulose, Jr on behalf of Donna Hall..(Paulose, Mathew)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Patrick W. Begos dated December 6, 2022., #1 Notice of Removal,. Granted. So Ordered. (Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York, answer due 1/6/2023.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/6/22) (yv)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Patrick W. Begos dated December 6, 2022. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America..(Begos, Patrick)
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplement to Notice of Removal served on John E. Hall, John E. Hall, as Administrator of the Estate of Scott Hall, The Estate of Scott Hall, Nancy Hall-Duncan, and Jeffrey Reese Hall on December 5, 2022. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America..(Begos, Patrick)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Defendants' Supplemental Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons with Notice and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavits of Service of the Amended Summons and Amended Complaint on CLICNY and LINA, #3 Exhibit C-Summons With Notice, #4 Exhibit D-Complaint, #5 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Service on CBRE Services, Inc., #6 Exhibit F-Answer by Donna Hall, #7 Exhibit G-Answer to Amended Complaint by Donna Hall).(Begos, Patrick)
November 30, 2022 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 30, 2022 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 30, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, with exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on John E. Hall, Individually, John Hall as Administrator of the Estate of Scott Hall, Nancy Hall-Duncan, and Jeffrey Reese Hall on 11/29/11. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America..(Begos, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America. Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America..(Begos, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Begos, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: Index No. 61276/2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27015262).Document filed by Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,, The Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Summons with Notice and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavits of Service).(Begos, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Hall
Represented By: James Michael Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Scott Hall
Represented By: James Michael Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hall-Duncan
Represented By: James Michael Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Reese Hall
Represented By: James Michael Lenihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hall
Represented By: Mathew Paulose, Jr
Represented By: Julie R Ledwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company Of New York,
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?