Lane et al v. James et al
Plaintiff: J. Mark Lane and James Sears
Defendant: Letitia James, Steven A Nigrelli and Miriam E. Rocah
Case Number: 7:2022cv10989
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Phoenix Marino, Assistant County Attorney, on behalf of all Defendants dated 2-1-23., #1 Complaint. Granted. So Ordered. (Letitia James answer due 3/3/2023; Steven A Nigrelli answer due 3/3/2023; Miriam E. Rocah answer due 3/3/2023.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 2/1/23) (yv)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Phoenix Marino, Assistant County Attorney, on behalf of all Defendants dated 2-1-23. Document filed by Miriam E. Rocah..(Marino, Phoenix)
January 26, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Phoenix Marino on behalf of Miriam E. Rocah..(Marino, Phoenix)
January 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Nonna on behalf of Miriam E. Rocah..(Nonna, John)
January 24, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Steven A Nigrelli served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. Service was accepted by Lynn Rundle. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by J. Mark Lane; James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
January 24, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Letitia James served on 1/18/2023, answer due 2/8/2023. Service was accepted by Ken Kruger. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by J. Mark Lane; James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
January 24, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Miriam E. Rocah served on 1/13/2023, answer due 2/3/2023. Service was accepted by Dorah Trimarchi. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by J. Mark Lane; James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Cody J. Wisniewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/11/2023) (rro)
January 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Cody J. Wisniewski to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27185342. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Cody J. Wisniewski in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit State of Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit State of Montana Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Wisniewski, Cody)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Adam J. Kraut to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Adam J. Kraut, Esq., for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Kraut is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/10/23) (yv)
January 10, 2023 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Adam J. Kraut to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27180462. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Adam J. Kraut to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-27180462. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam J. Kraut in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Kraut, Adam)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Letitia James..(pc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven A Nigrelli..(pc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miriam E. Rocah..(pc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
January 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
January 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
January 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
January 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicolas Rotsko to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MIRIAM E. ROCAH, in her official capacity as District Attorney for the County of Westchester, New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STEVEN A. NIGRELLI, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Police, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LETITIA JAMES, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears..(Rotsko, Nicolas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Letitia James, Steven A Nigrelli, Miriam E. Rocah. Document filed by J. Mark Lane, James Sears. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ).(Rotsko, Nicolas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane et al v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Mark Lane
Represented By: Nicolas Rotsko
Represented By: Adam Kraut
Represented By: Cody J. Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sears
Represented By: Nicolas Rotsko
Represented By: Adam Kraut
Represented By: Cody J. Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A Nigrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam E. Rocah
Represented By: John Nonna
Represented By: Phoenix Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?