Arriaga v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Arriaga
Defendant: Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Quandera T. Quick, Elaine Velez, John/Jane Doe #1, John/Jane Doe #2 and John/Jane Doe #3
Case Number: 7:2023cv01941
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Form Request Mailed: Request for Motions Guide and Discovery Guide from Anthony Arriaga 06-A-0542 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733 mailed on 04/18/2023. (ta)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER from A. Arriaga, dated 4/10/23 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court send him a Motions Guide, Discovery Guide and form for Representing Yourself at Trial. Document filed by Anthony Arriaga.(sc)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Request for Copies of Forms Received: Re #10 Letter. Request for Motion, Opposition to Motion and Reply Form, Discovery Guide and Representing Yourself at Trial from A. Arriaga, received on 4/10/23. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) Modified on 4/18/2023 (sc).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Anthony Arriaga, 06-A-0542, at Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116, Fallsburg, NY 12733, on 4/5/2023 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge.(sha) Modified on 4/5/2023 (sha).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Quandera T. Quick, Elaine Velez. (sha)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 4/5/2023 Re: Judge Vincent L. Briccetti #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Quandera T. Quick, Elaine Velez. (sha)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #7 Order of Service, #2 Complaint to New York State Attorney General at 28 Liberty Street, 16th Floor, New York, New York 10005. (sha)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants Michael Capra, Quandera T. Quick, Anthony Annucci, and Elaine Velez, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail: (1) a copy of this order and the complaint to the New York State Attorney General at 28 Liberty Street, 16th Floor, New York, New York 10005; and (2) an information package to Plaintiff. An "Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form, and the NYLAG Clinic's flyer, retainer, and intake form are attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/4/2023) (ks) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 5. Mailed to: Anthony Arriaga 06-A-0542 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733. Also mailed a copy to the Superintendent of Sullivan Correctional Facility. (kh)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/31/2023) (vn)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Anthony Arriaga.(sc)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Anthony Arriaga 06-A-0542 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733. (dsh)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/6/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/7/2023) (sha)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, John/Jane Doe #1, John/Jane Doe #2, John/Jane Doe #3, Quandera T. Quick, Elaine Velez. Document filed by Anthony Arriaga..(rdz)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anthony Arriaga..(rdz)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriaga v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quandera T. Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?