Perdue Farms Inc. v. A & M Bronx Baking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Perdue Farms Inc.
Defendant: A & M Bronx Baking, Inc., Martin Rodriguez, Craig M. Heatwole and Mitchell Heatwole
Case Number: 7:2023cv06777
Filed: August 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lp Diversity-Property Damage/Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Debra Klotz on behalf of A & M Bronx Baking, Inc., Martin Rodriguez..(Klotz, Jessica)
August 18, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mitchell Heatwole served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. Service was accepted by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Craig M. Heatwole served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. Service was accepted by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. A & M Bronx Baking, Inc. served on 8/10/2023, answer due 8/31/2023. Service was accepted by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)
August 8, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is so redesignated. (vba)
August 8, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 7, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to A & M Bronx Baking, Inc., Craig M. Heatwole, Mitchell Heatwole, Martin Rodriguez. (sj)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to A & M Bronx Baking, Inc., Martin Rodriguez, Craig M. Heatwole and Mitchell Heatwole, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)
August 3, 2023 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)
August 3, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sobel, Curtis)
August 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Curtis Sobel to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
August 3, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 3, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 3, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 3, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Curtis Sobel to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the jurisdiction of this action is based on diversity - the party/intervenor did not name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time - name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Please use the revised form found here # NYSD form page (lb)
August 2, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MISSING DIVERSITY INFORMATION - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis) Modified on 8/3/2023 (lb).
August 2, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sobel, Curtis) Modified on 8/3/2023 (jgo).
August 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A & M Bronx Baking, Inc., Craig M. Heatwole, Mitchell Heatwole, Martin Rodriguez. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28093574)Document filed by Perdue Farms Inc...(Sobel, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue Farms Inc. v. A & M Bronx Baking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perdue Farms Inc.
Represented By: Curtis Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & M Bronx Baking, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Rodriguez
Represented By: Jessica Debra Klotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig M. Heatwole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Heatwole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?