Colletti v. White Plains Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Joan Colletti
Defendant: White Plains Hospital, St. Vincent Hospital Westchester, Alejandro Ramirez, Cynthia Perry, Julia Novikov and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 7:2023cv07071
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to St. Vincent Hospital Westchester..(jgo)
September 19, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julia Novikov..(jgo)
September 19, 2023 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cynthia Perry..(jgo)
September 19, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Ramirez..(jgo)
September 18, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St. Vincent Hospital Westchester, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)
September 18, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Ramirez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cynthia Perry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)
September 18, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julia Novikov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to White Plains Hospital..(jgo)
September 15, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Masai I Lord to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 14, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to White Plains Hospital, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)
September 14, 2023 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to St. Vincent Hospital Westchester, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai) Modified on 9/15/2023 (jgo).
September 14, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Ramirez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai) Modified on 9/15/2023 (jgo).
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cynthia Perry, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai) Modified on 9/15/2023 (jgo).
September 14, 2023 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Julia Novikov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai) Modified on 9/15/2023 (jgo).
September 12, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Masai I Lord to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; File each summons separately or create one summons form with each party's name and address listed on a rider;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WHITE PLAINS HOSPITAL, ST. VINCENT HOPSITAL WESTCHESTER, ALEJANDRO RAMIREZ, CYNTHIA PERRY, JULIA NOVKIOV, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joan Colletti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit St. Vincent Summons, #2 Exhibit Ramirez Summons, #3 Exhibit Perry Summons, #4 Exhibit Novikov Summons).(Lord, Masai) Modified on 9/12/2023 (pc).
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lord, Masai)
August 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Masai I Lord. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: St. Vincent Hospital Westcher. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf)
August 11, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Masai I Lord. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 11, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 11, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 11, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-5, Julia Novikov, Cynthia Perry, Alejandro Ramirez, St. Vincent Hospital Westcher, White Plains Hospital. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28132692)Document filed by Joan Colletti..(Lord, Masai)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colletti v. White Plains Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Colletti
Represented By: Masai I Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Plains Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Vincent Hospital Westchester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Novikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?