Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds et al v. Zero Below Trucking Corp et al
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Jeffrey Singe, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456 and Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds
Defendant: Zero Below Trucking Corp and R. Andrew Hunter
Case Number: 7:2023cv08398
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Request for Entry of Default, Affidavit, Proposed Clerk's Certificates of Default served on Zero Below Trucking Corp and R. Andrew Hunter on 11/07/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 16 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to R. Andrew Hunter Individually. (tp)
November 7, 2023 Filing 15 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Kornfeld in Support. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Additonal Attachment - Request for Entry of Default).(Kornfeld, Daniel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Zero Below Trucking Corp. (tp)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Kornfeld in Support. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Additonal Attachment - Request for Entry of Default).(Kornfeld, Daniel)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 11/7/2023 (tp).
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 7, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel Kornfeld to RE-FILE Document #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (tp)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. R. Andrew Hunter served on 10/13/2023, answer due 11/3/2023. Service was accepted by Chizem. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds ; Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Zero Below Trucking Corp served on 10/13/2023, answer due 11/3/2023. Service was accepted by Chizem. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds ; Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint and Summons served on Secretary of Labor and Treasury Departments on 9/26/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 25, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to R. Andrew Hunter. (vf)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zero Below Trucking Corp. (vf)
September 25, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Ernest Kornfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: R. Andrew Hunter, Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
September 25, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
September 25, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
September 25, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to R. Andrew Hunter, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Jeffrey Singe, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zero Below Trucking Corp, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Jeffrey Singe, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. Andrew Hunter, Zero Below Trucking Corp. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28326835)Document filed by Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Jeffrey Singe, Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456..(Kornfeld, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds et al v. Zero Below Trucking Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds by Louis A. Picani, Joseph Sansone, Dominick Cassanelli, Jr., Jeffrey Singe
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Teamsters Local Union No. 456
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 456 Pension, Health & Welfare, Annuity, Education & Training, Industry Advancement, and Legal Services Funds
Represented By: Daniel Ernest Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zero Below Trucking Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Andrew Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?