Vescio et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vescio Brian, Vescio Constanca, Brian Vescio and Constanca Vescio
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2023cv08679
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 in Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant Bankers Standard Insurance Company ("Defendant") has filed a Verified Answer, dated November 14, 2023 (ECF No. 11), to Brian Vescio and Costanca Vescio's ("Plaintiffs") Complaint, dated October 24, 2023 (ECF No. 8). Thus, the Court waives the Initial Pre-Trial Conference requirement and directs the parties to submit a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (blank form attached hereto) by December 6, 2023. After review and approval of the Scheduling Order, the Court will issue an Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik for general pretrial purposes. The parties are directed to contact Judge Reznik within seven (7) business days of the date of the Order of Reference to schedule a conference. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 11/15/2023) (ate)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Complaint. Document filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company..(Suriano, Costantino)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR FILING OF COMPLAINT: With (i) this action having commenced in New York State court with Plaintiffs' filing of a Summons with Notice; (ii) the action having been removed to this Court on October 3, 2023; and (iii) Defendant subsequently having made demand on October 5, 2023 for Plaintiff's complaint: It is hereby stipulated, agreed and consented by the parties, that Plaintiffs be granted leave for the filing of the Complaint, as filed to the Court's electronic filing system (ECF) on October 24, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/31/2023) (ks)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Stipulation to File Complaint re: #8 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Vescio, Constanca Vescio..(Singer, Moshe)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Document filed by Brian Vescio, Constanca Vescio..(Singer, Moshe) Modified on 10/25/2023 (vf). Modified on 10/27/2023 (gp).
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons with Notice served on Bankers Standard Insurance Company on 09/14/2023. Service was accepted by Taryn Kindred / Managing Counsel. Document filed by Brian Vescio, Constanca Vescio..(Singer, Moshe)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Moshe Singer on behalf of Brian Vescio, Constanca Vescio..(Singer, Moshe)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Demand for Complaint. Document filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company..(Goodman, Robert)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Steven Goodman on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance Company..(Goodman, Robert)
October 4, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
October 4, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
October 4, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc,, Corporate Parent Ace American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation for Bankers Standard Insurance Company. Document filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company..(Suriano, Costantino)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Suriano, Costantino)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 034243/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28374708).Document filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons with Notice).(Suriano, Costantino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vescio et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vescio Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vescio Constanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Vescio
Represented By: Moshe Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constanca Vescio
Represented By: Moshe Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Costantino P. Suriano
Represented By: Robert Steven Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?