Fuentes v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Fuentes
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Anthony J. Annucci, Glenn S. Goord, Brian Fischer, Leroy Fields, Edward Burnett, Kimberly Lawrence and Daniel F Martuscello III
Case Number: 7:2023cv09464
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Jesus Fuentes DIN: 98A4737 Fishkill Correctional Facility 271 Matteawan Road Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508, at, on 12/5/2023 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edward Burnett, Daniel F Martuscello III. (nb)
December 5, 2023 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/5/2023 Re: Judge Philip M. Halpern #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Edward Burnett, Daniel F Martuscello III. (nb)
December 5, 2023 Mailed a copy of #7 Order of Service to New York State Attorney Generals Office Managing Attorneys Office, 28 Liberty Street, 16th Floor, New York, NY 10005. (nb)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against New York State DOCCS and the official-capacity claims against Defendants Goord, Fischer, and Annucci, leaving the personal-capacity claims against these individual defendants. The Court substitutes Acting DOCCS Commissioner Daniel F. Martuscello III, for former Commissioner Annucci, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d), to allow the official-capacity claims for prospective relief under Section 1983 to proceed against Acting Commissioner Martuscello. The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for Defendants Burnett and Martuscello, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary to effect service. The Clerk of Court is further directed to: (1) mail an information package to Plaintiff; and (2) mail a copy of this order to the New York State Attorney General's Office at: Managing Attorney's Office, 28 Liberty Street, 16th Floor, New York, NY 10005. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (And as further set forth herein.) New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision terminated. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/29/2023) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
November 27, 2023 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Jesus Fuentes DIN: 98A4737 Fishkill Correctional Facility 271 Matteawan Road Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508 on 12/1/23. (sc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER from J. Fuentes dated 11/21/23, re: Please advise me if my boxed-parcel mailing was ever delivered and received by your Office. Said parcel was prepared by me for shipping through this facility's Package Room on 10-18-23, as evidenced by the enclosed copy of "Authorization for Disposal of Personal Property"(Form 2068) etc. Document filed by Jesus Fuentes.(sc)
November 27, 2023 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #6 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from J. Fuentes received on 11/27/23. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
November 14, 2023 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
November 14, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
November 1, 2023 MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Jesus Fuentes DIN:98A4737 271 Matteawan Road Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508. ; and to Warden, Fishkill Correctional Facility (sha)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/31/2023) (vn)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Jesus Fuentes. (sac)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jesus Fuentes. (sac)
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Annucci, Edward Burnett, Leroy Fields, Brian Fischer, Glenn S. Goord, Kimberly Lawrence, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision. Document filed by Jesus Fuentes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Main Document, #2 Letter) (sac)
October 25, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn S. Goord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel F Martuscello III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?