Westchester County Fair Housing Board v. Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Westchester County Fair Housing Board
Defendant: Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers and Stanley Esposito
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Heritage Management Services, LLC
Interested Party: Deborah Tomasi and Peter Tomasi
Case Number: 7:2023cv10063
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board. ENDORSEMENT: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for a stay on Defendants' letter motion for a conference (ECF No. 9) until January 15, 2024. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/19/2023) (ate)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Peter Schuyler dated December 18, 2023 re: #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Patrick F. Palladino, Esq. dated December 13, 2023. Request to stay conference. Document filed by Deborah Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Deborah Tomasi(Individually), Peter Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Peter Tomasi(Individually)..(Schuyler, Peter)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Patrick F. Palladino, Esq. dated December 13, 2023. . Document filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board..(Carey, Sean)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Patrick F. Palladino, Esq. dated December 13, 2023. filed by Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Heritage Management Services, LLC, Stanley Esposito, Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's counsel is directed to respond to Defendants' pre-motion letter by Monday, December 18, 2023 at noon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/15/2023) ( Responses due by 12/18/2023) (ks)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Schuyler on behalf of Peter Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Peter Tomasi(Individually)..(Schuyler, Peter)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Schuyler on behalf of Deborah Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Deborah Tomasi(Individually)..(Schuyler, Peter)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Patrick F. Palladino, Esq. dated December 13, 2023. Document filed by Stanley Esposito(As a member of the Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers ), Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Heritage Management Services, LLC..(Palladino, Patrick)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Frank Palladino on behalf of Stanley Esposito(As a member of the Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers ), Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Heritage Management Services, LLC..(Palladino, Patrick)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers served on 11/16/2023; Stanley Esposito(Individually) served on 11/16/2023; Stanley Esposito(As a member of the Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers ) served on 11/16/2023; Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. served on 11/16/2023; Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers served on 11/16/2023; Heritage Management Services, LLC served on 11/16/2023. Service was accepted by Patrick F. Palladino, Esq., of Milber Makris Plousadis & Seiden, LLP, counsel for All Defendants. Document filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board..(Carey, Sean)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint, served. Deborah Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18) served on 11/16/2023; Deborah Tomasi(Individually) served on 11/16/2023; Peter Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18) served on 11/16/2023; Peter Tomasi(Individually) served on 11/16/2023. Service was accepted by Peter Schuyler, Esq., of Kitson & Schuyler P.C., Counsel for Interested Parties. Document filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board..(Carey, Sean)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carey, Sean)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers, Stanley Esposito(Individually), Stanley Esposito(As a member of the Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers ), Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Heritage Management Services, LLC, Deborah Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Deborah Tomasi(Individually), Peter Tomasi(As parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of 18), Peter Tomasi(Individually). (vf)
November 16, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Sean Timothy Carey to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
November 16, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 16, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 16, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc.; The HOAs Board of Managers; Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium Phase III Board of Managers; Heritage Management Services, LLC; Stanley Esposito, individually; Stanley Esposito, in his official capacity as a member of the Discovery Cove Board; Deborah Tomasi, individually; Deborah Tomasi, as parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of eighteen; Peter Tomasi, individually; Peter Tomasi, as parent and legal guardian of A.T., a child under the age of eighteen., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board..(Carey, Sean)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carey, Sean) Modified on 11/16/2023 (vf).
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers, Stanley Esposito(Individually), Stanley Esposito(As a member of the Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III), Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers, Heritage Management Services, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28573418)Document filed by Westchester County Fair Housing Board..(Carey, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester County Fair Housing Board v. Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester County Fair Housing Board
Represented By: Sean Timothy Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Frank Palladino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Half Moon Bay Homeowners Association, Inc., Board of Managers
Represented By: Patrick Frank Palladino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Cove at Half Moon Bay Condominium - Phase III Board of Managers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Esposito
Represented By: Patrick Frank Palladino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Heritage Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deborah Tomasi
Represented By: Peter Schuyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Peter Tomasi
Represented By: Peter Schuyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?