State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold v. Gree USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold
Defendant: Gree USA, INC., MJC America, Ltd., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd. and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd
Case Number: 7:2023cv10111
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Philip M Halpern
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lp Diversity-Property Damage/Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/13/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern..(jca) Modified on 1/9/2024 (jca).
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, INC., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd, MJC America, Ltd...(Trembitsky, Max)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Clark, William) Modified on 1/4/2024 (rju).
January 4, 2024 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for William N. Clark, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28767722. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court or State Bar of New Jersey;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (rju)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION TOEXTEND TIME TO RESPOND It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between Plaintiffs counsel for State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold and Defendants' counsel for Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, LTD., Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai,and Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, LTD., that the time for Defendants to answer, moveor otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint in this action is extended from December 22, 2023 until January 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai answer due 1/5/2024; Gree USA, INC. answer due 1/5/2024; Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd answer due 1/5/2024; MJC America, Ltd. answer due 1/5/2024. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 12/20/2023) (jca)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond. Document filed by Gree USA, INC...(Trembitsky, Max)
November 21, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd..(pc)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai. (vf)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MJC America, Ltd.. (vf)
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gree USA, INC.. (vf)
November 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert William Phelan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket Entry Party Name Error. Enter the party name as to whom summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
November 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
November 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert William Phelan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
November 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
November 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
November 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert William Phelan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Group, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyd's, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2023 (vf).
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MJC America, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gree USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Phelan, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai, Gree USA, INC., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd., MJC America, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28582846)Document filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold..(Phelan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold v. Gree USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as subrogee of Rosetta and Noel Arnold
Represented By: Robert William Phelan
Represented By: William N. Clark, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, INC.
Represented By: Max Trembitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd.
Represented By: Max Trembitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai
Represented By: Max Trembitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales, Ltd
Represented By: Max Trembitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?