Landau v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Herman Landau
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and GM Financial Leasing
Case Number: 7:2023cv10319
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the claims in this case have been settled (as only to Defendant GM Financial Leasing), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is discontinued with prejudice but without costs (as only to Defendant GM Financial Leasing); provided, however, that if settlement is not consummated within sixty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may apply by letter within the sixty-day period for restoration of the action to the Calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. SO ORDERED. GM Financial Leasing terminated. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/25/2024) (mml)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement as to GM Financial Leasing. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Karl Stutzman on behalf of GM Financial Leasing..(Stutzman, Andrew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. GM Financial Leasing waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. TransUnion, LLC waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saland, Tamir)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GM Financial Leasing..(jgo)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Tamir Saland to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Courthouse Assignment codes were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GM Financial Leasing, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saland, Tamir)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., GM Financial Leasing, TransUnion, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28610805)Document filed by Herman Landau..(Saland, Tamir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landau v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Landau
Represented By: Tamir Saland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Financial Leasing
Represented By: Andrew Karl Stutzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?