Menna v. The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Menna
Defendant: The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC and 120 Westchester Garage, LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv10333
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sasha Shafeek on behalf of The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(Shafeek, Sasha)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine M. Capitolo on behalf of The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(Capitolo, Christine)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Anthony Torino on behalf of The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(Torino, Bruce)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(Torino, Bruce)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ahold Delhaize USA, Inc. for The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC. Document filed by The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(Torino, Bruce)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 120 Westchester Garage, LLC served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent. Document filed by Alfred Menna..(Gewirtz, Evan)
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky Authorized Agent. Document filed by Alfred Menna..(Gewirtz, Evan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against 120 Westchester Garage, LLC, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC. Document filed by Alfred Menna..(Gewirtz, Evan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 120 Westchester Garage, LLC, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC..(jgo)
November 29, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 29, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Evan Gewirtz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 29, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 29, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Evan Gewirtz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
November 29, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC & 120 Westchester Garage, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alfred Menna..(Gewirtz, Evan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gewirtz, Evan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28620352)Document filed by Alfred Menna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Gewirtz, Evan) Modified on 11/29/2023 (jgo).
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Evan Gewirtz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Evan Gewirtz to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/4/2023. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menna v. The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Menna
Represented By: Evan Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Anthony Torino
Represented By: Christine M. Capitolo
Represented By: Sasha Shafeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 120 Westchester Garage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?