Cleckley et al v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Cleckley, Gisbelle Cleckley, Individually and Gisbelle Cleckley
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc. d/b/a OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE and Bloomin Brands, Inc. doing business as Outback Steakhouse
Case Number: 7:2023cv10339
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 5/15/2024. Fact Discovery due by 7/10/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2024. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2024 at 10:45 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel (by phone). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/18/2024) (mml)
January 18, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 1/18/2024. Plaintiffs' counsel Devon Radlin, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel Melissa Manna, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Tatiana Codner appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules a conference for July 23, 2024 at 10:45 a.m. via telephone. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by July 9, 2024; opposition due July 19, 2024. This proceeding was recorded via the AT&T Teleconference platform. (Status Conference set for 7/23/2024 at 10:45 AM via telephone). (wc)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Notice of Initial Court Conference. Document filed by Bloomin Brands, Inc...(Manna, Melissa)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 12:30 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. The parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference call-in number: (877) 336 1839. Access code: 1047966#. (mml)
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bloomin Brands, Inc...(Manna, Melissa)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Bloomin Brands, Inc. served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. Service was accepted by Sara Esposito-Employee. Document filed by Christopher Cleckley; Gisbelle Cleckley..(Radlin, Devon)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bloomin Brands, Inc...(pc)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLOOMIN' BRANDS, INC d/b/a OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Cleckley, Gisbelle Cleckley, Individually..(Radlin, Devon)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Radlin, Devon)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bloomin' Brands, Inc. d/b/a OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE. Document filed by Christopher Cleckley, Gisbelle Cleckley, Individually..(Radlin, Devon)
November 28, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 28, 2023 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-28614171, paid on 11/27/2023..(gp)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Devon M Radlin. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
November 28, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Devon M Radlin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Devon M Radlin to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 12/4/2023. (pc)
November 28, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Devon M Radlin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gisbelle Cleckley, Individually, Bloomin' Brands, Inc. d/b/a OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleckley et al v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cleckley
Represented By: Devon M Radlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisbelle Cleckley, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisbelle Cleckley
Represented By: Devon M Radlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc. d/b/a OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin Brands, Inc. doing business as Outback Steakhouse
Represented By: Melissa Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?