Sheinowitz et al v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: David Sheinowitz and Marie Sheinowitz
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 7:2023cv10971
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Any pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to amend or join additional parties must be requested by 5/31/24. The parties should be prepared for at least the JointPretrial Order to be due 30 days after the close of discovery. SO ORDERED. Depositions due by 5/3/2024. Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2024. Expert Discovery due by 7/31/2024. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/25/2024) (vfr)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Please note that under SDNY ECF Rule 13.21, discovery requests and responses are not to be electronically filed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel) (Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by David Sheinowitz, Marie Sheinowitz..(Mosbacher, Stuart)
January 25, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 1/25/2024. Plaintiffs' counsel Stuart Mosbacher, Esq. appears telephonically. Defendant's counsel Joseph Velez, Esq. appears telephonically. Law Clerk Anthony Nania appears telephonically. Case Management Plan signed. The Court schedules a conference for September 10, 2024 at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 621. Pre-Motion letter(s) to be submitted by August 27, 2024; opposition due September 3, 2024. This proceeding was recorded via the AT&T Teleconference platform. (Status Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (wc)
January 23, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC..(Velez, Joseph)
January 22, 2024 Filing 6 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES Document filed by David Sheinowitz, Marie Sheinowitz..(Mosbacher, Stuart)
January 22, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Wayne Mosbacher on behalf of David Sheinowitz, Marie Sheinowitz..(Mosbacher, Stuart)
December 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 11:15 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. The parties are directed to attend by phone using the following information: Toll-Free Tele-conference call-in number: (877) 336 1839. Access code: 1047966#. (mml)
December 20, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
December 20, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 20, 2023 Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
December 20, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Daniel Velez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Document filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC..(Velez, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Velez, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF006000-2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28714414).Document filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C-Defendant's Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit D-Plaintiff's Response to Combined Demands).(Velez, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheinowitz et al v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sheinowitz
Represented By: Stuart Wayne Mosbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Sheinowitz
Represented By: Stuart Wayne Mosbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?