Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings and Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 7:2024cv02370
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Paige in Support re: #10 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery.. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Williamson in Support re: #10 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery.. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Stalzer in Support re: #10 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery.. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #8 Letter Motion for Discovery. The Court previously granted Plaintiff's motion to serve a third-party subpoena on April 11, 2024 at ECF 7. Therefore, this motion is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/20/2024) (mml)
May 18, 2024 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacqueline James dated May 18, 2024. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Discovery. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to serve a third-party subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.26(d)(1). An initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will not be scheduled until sometime after Defendant has answered. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/11/24) (yv)
April 10, 2024 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Discovery Third Party Early Discovery addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacqueline James dated April 10.2024. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline)
March 29, 2024 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc)
March 29, 2024 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 29, 2024 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 29, 2024 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 29, 2024 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacqueline Marie James. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Strike 3 Holdings, John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems LLC for Strike 3 Holdings. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings..(James, Jacqueline)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29147506)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?