Zhao v. United States of America Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2006cv00106
Filed: February 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
Presiding Judge: Hugh B. Scott
Presiding Judge: William M. Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 DECISION AND ORDER ON BENCH TRIAL. Court finds that Defendant is liable to Plaintiff for Rhodes' assault and battery and false arrest. The Court finds that Plaintiff is entitled to recover $64,313.18 in past medical expenses, $1,838.91 in past lost earnings, $260,000 in past pain and suffering, $125,000 in future pain and suffering, and $10,000 for false arrest for a total recovery of $461,152.09. The still pending portions of the Motions in Limine are resolv ed as follow: denying 131 Motion in Limine; denying as moot or otherwise resolved during trial 134 Motion in Limine; denying as moot or otherwise resolved during trial 137 Motion in Limine. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/042017. (LMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 92 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING as moot Defendant's 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENYING Plaintiff's 96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge on 5/30/2013. (MEAL)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 54 Affidavit, filed by United States of America Department of Homeland SecurityDefense application for reasonable expenses for Motion to Compel (Docket No. 54) is granted; plaintiff and her counsel are jointly liable for $705.68 to defendant.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 12/20/2010. (DRH)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE HUGH B. SCOTTORDER re 24 Scheduling Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, 25 MOTION to Compel (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel, Preclude and Further Amend the Scheduling Or der) filed by United States of America Department of Homeland SecurityDefendant's Motion to Compel (Docket No. 25) is granted in part.Motions terminated: 25 MOTION to Compel (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel, Pre clude and Further Amend the Scheduling Order) filed by United States of America Department of Homeland Security.Defendant's motion for extension of the current Scheduling Order (Docket No. 24) is granted; Discovery completed by 3/4/2011; defense expert disclosure by 1/31/2011; all expert disclosure due 2/22/2011; Motions due by 6/3/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for Wed., 9/21/2011, 9:00 AM, before Hon. William M. Skretny. Jury selection and Trial begins Tues., 11/29/2010, 9:30 AM, before Chief Judge Skretny.So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Hugh B. Scott on 11/17/2010. (DRH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhao v. United States of America Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?