Fuller et al v. Summit Treestands, LLC
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Fuller and Theresa A. Fuller
Defendant: Summit Treestands, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00330
Filed: May 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Arcara
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J. McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendation re 83 . Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 6/30/2009. (JMB)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPORT, RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Failure to Warn, Manufacturing Defect and Warranty Claims filed by Summit Treestands, LLC, re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Proximate Cause to Establish Any Products Liability Claim filed by Summit Treestands, LLC. Objections due ten days from receipt. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/11/09. (DAZ)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendation re 50 .. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 2/25/2009. (JMB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller et al v. Summit Treestands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Treestands, LLC
Represented By: Teresa Brophy Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Fuller
Represented By: Michael Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Fuller
Represented By: Michael Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?