Hoyle v. Dimond et al
Plaintiff: |
Eric E. Hoyle |
Defendant: |
Frederick Dimond, Robert Dimond and Most Holy Family Monastery |
Counter Claimant: |
Frederick Dimond, Robert Dimond and Most Holy Family Monastery |
Counter Defendant: |
Frederick Dimond, Robert Dimond and Most Holy Family Monastery |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00347 |
Filed: |
May 9, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Buffalo Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Curtin |
Nature of Suit: |
Defendant |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2014 |
Filing
136
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-DECISION AND ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge McCarthy's Report and Recommendation. Final judgment shall be entered as to all claims not previously dismissed, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Counterclaims is denied as moot. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 3/19/2014. (JEC)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
124
DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 121 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 7/24/2013. (JEC)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing
116
DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 106 Motion for Summary Judgment on their Counterclaims with respect to the counterclaims for defamation, conversion, misappropriation of trade secrets, and breach of fiduciary duty. The court sua sponte grants summary judgment to plaintiff dismissing Defendants' Counterclaims alleging violations of the Lanham Act and the ECPA. A status telephone conference shall be held on 4/24/2013 at 2 p.m. to schedule further proceedings. (The court will initiate the call.) Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 3/14/2013. (JEC)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
114
DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 107 MOTION for Reconsideration. Before the court considers the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on their counterclaims, counsel are directed to advise the court within two weeks whether they wish to make a final attempt at mediation. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 11/7/2012. (JEC)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
106
DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in part. The ocmplaint is dismissed. A telephone conference shall be held on 7/11/2012 at 2 p.m. to discuss the Defendants' counterclaims. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/22/2012. (JEC)
|
June 1, 2011 |
Filing
72
DECISION AND ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel to disclose the most recent volume of plaintiff's journal to defense counsel. The court declines to order disclosure of the earlier volumes. The court will conduct a telephone conference wi th counsel on 7/25/2011 at 2 p.m. to establish a further schedule for the filing of dispositive motions or to set a date for trial. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/1/2011. (Modified on 6/1/2011, attaching amended Decision and Order with 7/25/2011 telephone conference date included) (JEC).
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion to amend the Complaint, denying both 34 Defendant's Motion for Contempt and Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff sha ll file his Amended Complaint by 3/27/2009, and Defense Counsel shall answer accordingly. A Scheduling Telephone Conference will then be held on 5/11/2009 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 3/5/2009. (JEC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?