Sonberg v. Niagara County Jail Medical Department Head et al
Plaintiff: |
Norman C. Sonberg |
Defendant: |
Niagara County Jail Medical Department Head, James Hohensse and Head Nurse Chris |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv00364 |
Filed: |
May 19, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Chemung |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Skretny |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
270
DECISION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 249 MOTION for relief from judgment. Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 6/5/2013. (JEC)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
239
DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendants' [142, 161] Motions for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to close the case and to enter judgment in favor of Defendants. (Clerk to follow up.) Signed by Hon. John T. Curtin on 11/10/2012. (JEC)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing
177
DECISION AND ORDER denying 134 Motion to Compel; denying 144 Motion. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on February 4, 2011. (APG)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing
113
DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on July 30, 2010. (APG)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing
81
TEXT ORDER. Whereas on or about February 18, 2010, plaintiff, Norman Sonberg, submitted to this Court a package of documents he sought to have filed under seal and after discussion between the parties and the Court during the March 30, 2010 Status C onference about those documents and the possibility of some of the documents being responsive to defendants' outstanding discovery demands, this Court directed that a review of the documents be undertaken by the Court and further, that any docum ents reflecting the plaintiff's criminal history were to be provided to counsel for the defendants. The Court has undertaken such a review of the documents submitted by plaintiff and has determined that the attached documents, which reflect the plaintiff's criminal history, are responsive to the pending discovery requests and are hereby being supplied to counsel for the defendants. The Court notes that the attached documents have been redacted by the Court to remove any personally id entifying information of the plaintiff, including date of birth and Social Security number. It is hereby ordered that the balance of the documents submitted by plaintiff on or about February 18, 2010 are to be filed under seal. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to file such documents under seal. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on April 30, 2010. (APG)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
33
DECISION AND ORDER denying 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on September 22, 2009. (APG)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
31
DECISION and ORDER re: service of Summons and Amended Complaint (Thomas Beilein); identification of defendants and denying 27 and 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr. on September 3, 2009. (APG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?